Famous Pacific Shipping (Nz) Limited was incorporated on 24 Mar 1992 and issued a number of 9429038995934. This registered LTD company has been run by 14 directors: Deborah Marie Mckenzie - an active director whose contract started on 30 Nov 2018,
Vincent Yen Shan Yik - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jan 2022,
Jonathan Wei Hsin Ooi - an active director whose contract started on 19 Apr 2022,
Ryan Cheng How Tang - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Nov 2021 and was terminated on 19 Apr 2022,
Tak Loi Lai - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Nov 2018 and was terminated on 21 Jan 2022.
According to our database (updated on 26 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: Po Box 53110, Auckland Airport, Auckland, 2150 (types include: postal, office).
Until 29 Jun 2012, Famous Pacific Shipping (Nz) Limited had been using 8 Keith Avenue, Remuera, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb found past names for the company: from 20 Feb 1996 to 15 Feb 1999 they were named Macro Link (N.z.) Limited, from 16 Oct 1992 to 20 Feb 1996 they were named Goldsworthy Trading Limited and from 24 Mar 1992 to 16 Oct 1992 they were named Glynford Holdings Limited.
A total of 140000 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 140000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Famous Holdings Pte Ltd (an other) located at 05-03 Keppel Distripark, Singapore postcode 099447. Famous Pacific Shipping (Nz) Limited has been classified as "Freight forwarding including goods handling nec" (ANZSIC I529240).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 5-7 Amelia Earhart Avenue, Airport Oaks, Auckland, 2022 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 06 Nov 2019
Principal place of activity
5-7 Amelia Earhart Avenue, Airport Oaks, Auckland, 2022 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 8 Keith Avenue, Remuera, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 31 Mar 2008 to 29 Jun 2012
Address #2: 10 Keith Avenue, Remuera, Auckland
Registered address used from 25 Nov 2004 to 31 Mar 2008
Address #3: 18 Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland
Registered address used from 05 Aug 2002 to 25 Nov 2004
Address #4: 10 Rennie Drive, Airport Oaks, Auckland
Physical address used from 17 Aug 2001 to 30 Jul 2004
Address #5: 87 Waipuna Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Sep 2000 to 10 Sep 2000
Address #6: 28 Rennie Drive, Airport Oaks, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Sep 2000 to 17 Aug 2001
Address #7: 5 Clare Place, Mt Wellington, Auckland
Physical address used from 14 Aug 1998 to 10 Sep 2000
Address #8: 5 Clare Place, Mt Wellington, Auckland
Registered address used from 14 Aug 1998 to 05 Aug 2002
Address #9: 124 Symonds Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 06 Nov 1992 to 14 Aug 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 140000
Annual return filing month: November
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 16 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 140000 | |||
Other (Other) | Famous Holdings Pte Ltd |
#05-03 Keppel Distripark Singapore 099447 Singapore |
14 Jan 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Goldsworthy, Marcus Willard |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Goldsworthy, Marcus Willard |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Goldsworthy, Marcus Willard |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Goldsworthy, Mee Ching |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Davidson, Garry William |
Northcote |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Davidson, Garry William |
Northcote |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Individual | Goldsworthy, Mee Ching |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Entity | Goldsworthy Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046099914 Company Number: 6274354 |
15 Dec 2017 - 07 Feb 2018 | |
Entity | Goldsworthy Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046099914 Company Number: 6274354 |
15 Dec 2017 - 07 Feb 2018 | |
Individual | Goldsworthy, Mee Ching |
Remuera Auckland New Zealand |
24 Mar 1992 - 14 Jan 2015 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Deborah Marie Mckenzie - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2018
Address: Somerville, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2018
Vincent Yen Shan Yik - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jan 2022
Address: Singapore, 459289 Singapore
Address used since 20 Jan 2022
Jonathan Wei Hsin Ooi - Director
Appointment date: 19 Apr 2022
Address: Singapore, 544685 Singapore
Address used since 19 Apr 2022
Ryan Cheng How Tang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Nov 2021
Termination date: 19 Apr 2022
Address: Singapore, 669615 Singapore
Address used since 26 Nov 2021
Tak Loi Lai - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2018
Termination date: 21 Jan 2022
Address: #15-01, Singapore, 436882 Singapore
Address used since 30 Nov 2018
Jui-i Lim - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 May 2018
Termination date: 26 Nov 2021
Address: Singapore, 127317 Singapore
Address used since 15 May 2018
Ho Sung Tan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jan 2015
Termination date: 30 Nov 2018
Address: Frankel Estate, Singapore, 456939 Singapore
Address used since 14 Jan 2015
Devdut Mahadev Dhanjee - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2017
Termination date: 30 Nov 2018
Address: Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2017
Sylvia Shao Ling Neo - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Nov 2017
Termination date: 15 May 2018
Address: Singapore, 486075 Singapore
Address used since 20 Nov 2017
Marcus Willard Goldsworthy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Oct 1992
Termination date: 20 Nov 2017
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2008
Sing Mein Ang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Aug 2016
Termination date: 20 Nov 2017
Address: Singapore, Singapore
Address used since 16 Aug 2016
Thijs Sommen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Jan 2015
Termination date: 01 Sep 2015
Address: Burgundy Hill, Singapore, 658815 Singapore
Address used since 14 Jan 2015
Mee Ching Goldsworthy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jul 1999
Termination date: 14 Jan 2015
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2008
Stephen Naismith Fleming - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Mar 1992
Termination date: 07 Oct 1992
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland,
Address used since 24 Mar 1992
Jenner Cargo International Limited
47 Richard Pearse Drive
Jenners Worldwide Freight Limited
47 Richard Pearse Drive
Nz International Shipping Services Limited
51 Richard Pearse Drive
Marlin Warehouse And Storage Limited
51 Richard Pearse Drive
Marlin Transport Limited
51 Richard Pearse Drive
Ainscorp Pty. Ltd.
58 Richard Pearse Drive
Aion Cargo Solutions Limited
16 Rennie Drive
Bollore Logistics New Zealand Limited
14a Rennie Drive
Gsf Logistics Limited
18 Rennie Drive
Kerry Logistics (oceania) Limited
7 Kingsford Smith Place
Maersk Logistics & Services New Zealand Limited
14 Amelia Earhart Avenue
Rohlig New Zealand Limited
10a Rennie Drive