Tsengs Enterprises (Nz) Limited, a registered company, was registered on 24 Apr 1992. 9429038995736 is the business number it was issued. "Meat processing" (business classification C111170) is how the company is classified. This company has been run by 3 directors: Fang Yih Tseng - an active director whose contract started on 24 Apr 1992,
Fang-Mei Hsu - an active director whose contract started on 11 Jan 2005,
Fang-Mei Hsu - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Apr 1992 and was terminated on 12 Dec 2003.
Last updated on 02 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 13 Prairie Place, Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042 (types include: registered, physical).
Tsengs Enterprises (Nz) Limited had been using 52 Apsley Drive, Avonhead, Christchurch as their physical address up to 17 Jun 2022.
Past names for this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 24 Apr 1992 to 11 Jun 2019 they were named Tsengs Enterprises (N.z.) Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 99 shares) - Tseng, Fang Yih - located at 8042, Hornby South, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
13 Prairie Place, Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 52 Apsley Drive, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 May 2013 to 17 Jun 2022
Address #2: 52 Apsley Drive, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Nov 2010 to 17 Jun 2022
Address #3: Sauer Stanley, P O Box 13-246, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Oct 1996 to 13 May 2013
Address #4: 52 Apsley Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered address used from 15 Oct 1996 to 11 Nov 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Tseng, Fang Yih |
Hornby South Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
24 Apr 1992 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hsu, Fang-mei |
Hornby South Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
12 Aug 2005 - 12 Aug 2005 |
Individual | Hsu, Fang-mei |
Christchurch |
24 Apr 1992 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Individual | Hsu, Fang-mei |
Christchurch |
12 Aug 2005 - 12 Aug 2005 |
Fang Yih Tseng - Director
Appointment date: 24 Apr 1992
Address: Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jul 2022
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2015
Fang-mei Hsu - Director
Appointment date: 11 Jan 2005
Address: Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jul 2022
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2015
Fang-mei Hsu - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Apr 1992
Termination date: 12 Dec 2003
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 24 Apr 1992
Garrett Enterprises Limited
57 Apsley Drive
Anra Trading Limited
11 Wiltshire Mews
Ht Enterprises Limited
67 Apsley Drive
Asian Town Investment Limited
23 Abingdon Court
New Venture Investment Limited
23 Abingdon Court
Wheezy Digital Limited
3 Kedleston Drive
Dai's Food Limited
2/221 Annex Road Middleton
Freshpork New Zealand Limited
92 Russley Road
Greenstone Home Kills Limited
6e Pope Street
Kisco Foods International Limited
6 Vulcan Place
Malvern Homekill Services Limited
32 B Sheffield Crescent
Roza Food Limited
7/34 Sonter Rd