Stirling Brook Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 May 1992. 9429038982170 is the business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Kathleen Joan Dodson - an active director whose contract started on 22 May 1992,
Michael Edwin Watson - an active director whose contract started on 29 May 2002,
Robert Henry Taylor - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 May 1992 and was terminated on 29 May 2002.
Updated on 18 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (type: physical, service).
Stirling Brook Limited had been using 22 Scott Street, Blenheim as their physical address until 29 May 2017.
Previous aliases for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 22 May 1992 to 30 May 2002 they were named Tetley Park Farm Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 5000 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 5000 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jun 2016 to 29 May 2017
Address: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Jun 2011 to 08 Jun 2016
Address: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 07 Jun 2011
Address: 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 08 Jun 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 28 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Watson, Michael Edwin |
Rd 1 Seddon 7285 New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Dodson, Kathleen Joan |
Rd 1 Seddon 7285 New Zealand |
26 May 2004 - |
Kathleen Joan Dodson - Director
Appointment date: 22 May 1992
Address: Rd 1, Seddon, 7285 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2010
Michael Edwin Watson - Director
Appointment date: 29 May 2002
Address: Rd 1, Seddon, 7285 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2010
Robert Henry Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 May 1992
Termination date: 29 May 2002
Address: Heretaunga, Upper Hutt,
Address used since 22 May 1992
Wairau River Wines Limited
2 Alfred Street
8 Wired Brewing Limited
2 Alfred Street
Bryce Trustee Limited
2 Alfred Street
Alva Limited
2 Alfred Street
Crow Tavern Limited
2 Alfred Street
G & S Moleta Trustee Limited
2 Alfred Street