Boston Properties Limited was incorporated on 01 Nov 1993 and issued a business number of 9429038775185. The registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Graeme Geddes Bulling - an active director whose contract started on 01 Nov 1993,
Viviene Sidonie Baxter - an active director whose contract started on 17 Aug 2009,
William Bulling - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Jun 2003 and was terminated on 09 Oct 2007,
Vivienne Beverly Straffon - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Nov 1993 and was terminated on 21 Jul 2003.
According to our information (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), the company filed 1 address: 61 Raurenga Avenue, Royal Oak, Auckland, 1023 (types include: registered, service).
Until 21 Jul 2006, Boston Properties Limited had been using 31 Milton Road, Mt Eden, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Milton Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Royal Oak, Auckland postcode 1023. Boston Properties Limited was classified as "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230).
Previous address
Address #1: 31 Milton Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 21 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 01 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Milton Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034895511 |
Royal Oak Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Baxter, Viviene Sidonie |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2020 - 02 Sep 2023 |
Director | Bulling, Graeme Geddes |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
06 Oct 2020 - 02 Sep 2023 |
Individual | Baxter, Viviene Sidonie |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
06 Feb 2010 - 03 Sep 2019 |
Individual | Straffon, Mary Grace |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
04 Jun 2018 - 03 Sep 2019 |
Individual | Straffon, Vivienne Beverly |
Epsom Auckland |
01 Nov 1993 - 09 Oct 2007 |
Individual | Bulling, Graeme Geddes |
Mt Eden Auckland |
01 Nov 1993 - 18 Mar 2005 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Graeme Geddes Bulling - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1993
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2006
Viviene Sidonie Baxter - Director
Appointment date: 17 Aug 2009
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2015
William Bulling - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2003
Termination date: 09 Oct 2007
Address: Redlynch, Cairns,
Address used since 30 Jun 2003
Vivienne Beverly Straffon - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1993
Termination date: 21 Jul 2003
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Nov 1993
Broadside Limited
30 Pencarrow Avenue
Milton Trustee Limited
30 Pencarrow Avenue
Quantex Limited
30 Pencarrow Avenue
Zybex Consulting Group Limited
30 Pencarrow Avenue
S.gurdiyal Singh & Family Investment Limited
34c Aberfoyle Street
Vogels Holdings Limited
36 Pencarrow Avenue
Antipodes E-commerce Company Limited
19a Kakariki Avenue
Harry International Limited
15 Kakariki Avenue
Khyber Pass (nz) Investment Limited
25 Wilding Avenue
Ling Ling Limited
646 Mount Eden Road
Marsden Structures Limited
3 Aberfoyle Street
Rad Property Investment 2016 Limited
2 Irene Avenue