Pegasus Health Membership Limited, a registered company, was launched on 26 Mar 1993. 9429038758331 is the business number it was issued. "Health service nec" (ANZSIC Q859940) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been managed by 30 directors: Caroline Margaret Christie - an active director whose contract began on 29 Nov 2017,
Richard Andrew Rawstron - an active director whose contract began on 23 Sep 2020,
Hana Rose Huria Royal - an active director whose contract began on 15 Sep 2021,
Graham John Muir - an active director whose contract began on 23 Nov 2022,
Lucinda Jane Whiteley - an active director whose contract began on 01 Dec 2023.
Updated on 01 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 401 Madras Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: service, registered).
Pegasus Health Membership Limited had been using Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their physical address up until 12 Apr 2019.
Former names for this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 26 Mar 1993 to 24 Sep 2003 they were named Pegasus Medical Group Limited.
A total of 23261 shares are allocated to 18 shareholders (17 groups). The first group consists of 3898 shares (16.76 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 67 shares (0.29 per cent). Lastly there is the third share allocation (67 shares 0.29 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical address used from 04 Mar 2019 to 12 Apr 2019
Address #2: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 04 Mar 2019 to 28 Apr 2020
Address #3: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Apr 2017 to 04 Mar 2019
Address #4: Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 May 2016 to 04 Apr 2017
Address #5: Level 1, 567 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 May 2012 to 05 May 2016
Address #6: Hfk Limited Chartered Accountants, Unit 4, 567 Wairakei Road, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Apr 2011 to 02 May 2012
Address #7: Unit 4/567 Wairakei Road, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Feb 2006 to 18 Apr 2011
Address #8: C/-hilson Fagerlund & Keyse, 12 Main North Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 06 May 1998 to 02 Feb 2006
Address #9: C/- Hilson Fagerlund And Keyse, 12 Main North Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 06 May 1998 to 06 May 1998
Address #10: C/- Lane Neave Ronaldson, Level 15, Price Waterhouse Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 01 May 1998 to 06 May 1998
Address #11: C/- Hilson Fagerlund & Keyse, 12 Main North Road, Christchurch
Registered address used from 02 May 1996 to 02 Feb 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 23261
Annual return filing month: November
Financial report filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 28 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 3898 | |||
Individual | Chambers, Brett |
Burnside Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
28 Nov 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Berryman, Stephen |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Ashcroft, Philip |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Burgess, Kim |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Bennetts, Graeme |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #6 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Royal, Hana Rose Huria |
Upper Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
05 Oct 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #7 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Averis, Neil |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #8 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Chin, Colin |
Christchurch New Zealand |
19 Apr 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #9 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Director | Christie, Caroline Margaret |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #10 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Hudson, Ben |
Beckenham Christchurch 8023 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2020 - |
Director | Hudson, Ben |
Beckenham Christchurch 8023 New Zealand |
28 Sep 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #11 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Chambers, Rose |
Lyttelton New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #12 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Baker, Stephen |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - |
Shares Allocation #13 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Caldwell, Andrea |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #14 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Chen-green, Annie |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #15 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Baker, Jeremy |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #16 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Chin, Adrienne |
Christchurch New Zealand |
19 Apr 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #17 Number of Shares: 67 | |||
Individual | Chambers, Jonathan |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ackermann, Adrienne |
Christchurch |
03 May 2006 - 03 May 2006 |
Individual | Burgess, Gerry |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 28 Sep 2020 |
Individual | Carpenter, Graeme |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Biggs, Robert |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Batchelor, Jane |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 28 Sep 2020 |
Individual | Fagerlund, Neville Petrie |
Richmond Christchurch 8061 New Zealand |
01 Jul 2010 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Brown, William Lee |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Battye, Jo |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Causer, Michael |
Christchurch |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2007 |
Individual | Cameron, Keith |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Bartle, Alex |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Blackman, Janet |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 24 Nov 2022 |
Individual | Chima, Harsed |
Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
19 Apr 2007 - 24 Nov 2022 |
Individual | Airey, Philip |
Christchurch New Zealand |
26 Mar 1993 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Ashmore, Sharon |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 05 Oct 2021 |
Individual | Aitken, Rob |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Blackman, Robert |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Allison, Cathy |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Borowczyk, James |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Campbell, John |
Redcliffs Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Black, Catherine |
Christchurch |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2007 |
Individual | Anderson, Nicole |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Brockway, Keith |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 03 May 2006 |
Individual | Bargh, Susan |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Buchan, Kaye |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 03 May 2006 |
Individual | Berryman, Jenni |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Burke, David |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Baker, Ruth |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Beattie, Nicola |
Christchurch |
26 Mar 1993 - 03 May 2006 |
Individual | Bowes, Lesley |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Boyd, John |
Christchurch New Zealand |
03 May 2006 - 19 Apr 2018 |
Caroline Margaret Christie - Director
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2017
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Nov 2017
Richard Andrew Rawstron - Director
Appointment date: 23 Sep 2020
Address: Leeston, Leeston, 7632 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Sep 2020
Hana Rose Huria Royal - Director
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2021
Address: Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Sep 2021
Graham John Muir - Director
Appointment date: 23 Nov 2022
Address: Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Nov 2022
Lucinda Jane Whiteley - Director
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2023
Address: Lyttelton, Lyttelton, 8082 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2023
Simon Mostyn Hayden Wynn Thomas - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Jun 2017
Termination date: 30 Nov 2023
Address: Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jun 2017
Ben Hudson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2018
Termination date: 23 Nov 2022
Address: Beckenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2018
Vanessa Joan Weenink - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Sep 2019
Termination date: 31 Jan 2022
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Sep 2019
Sharon Elizabeth Ashmore - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2015
Termination date: 15 Sep 2021
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2015
Gayle Peta O'duffy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2017
Termination date: 23 Sep 2020
Address: Methven, Methven, 7730 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Nov 2017
John Peter Coughlan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2007
Termination date: 25 Sep 2019
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2007
Leslie John Toop - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Nov 2005
Termination date: 03 Oct 2018
Address: Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Apr 2016
Harsed Hiralal Chima - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2007
Termination date: 18 Oct 2017
Address: Marshland, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Apr 2016
Gayle Peta O'duffy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 2014
Termination date: 18 Oct 2017
Address: Methven, Methven, 7730 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Nov 2014
Anna Hillary Bolman Currie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Nov 2013
Termination date: 07 Jun 2017
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Nov 2013
Mary-anne Bellamy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Nov 2003
Termination date: 11 Nov 2015
Address: Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Sep 2013
Martin Robert Seers - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Oct 1996
Termination date: 05 Nov 2014
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 30 Oct 1996
Andrew Mark Manning - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 2008
Termination date: 13 Nov 2013
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 05 Nov 2008
Stephen Paul Mccormack - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1993
Termination date: 29 Oct 2008
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Mar 1993
Graham Robert Burton Mcgeoch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Oct 1998
Termination date: 31 Oct 2007
Address: Governors Bay, R D 1, Lyttelton,
Address used since 28 Oct 1998
David Riyad Zarifeh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2004
Termination date: 31 Oct 2007
Address: Sumner, Christchurch,
Address used since 03 Nov 2004
David Francis Caygill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2004
Termination date: 31 Oct 2007
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 09 Nov 2004
Sandra Jill Hicks - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Oct 1998
Termination date: 02 Nov 2005
Address: Christchurch 4,
Address used since 28 Oct 1998
Niall Anthony Holland - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Nov 2001
Termination date: 02 Nov 2005
Address: Clifton Hill, Christchurch,
Address used since 07 Nov 2001
William Paul Mcsweeney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2000
Termination date: 01 Apr 2004
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 01 Nov 2000
James Philip Gray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1993
Termination date: 06 May 2003
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Mar 1993
Lewis John Hudson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1993
Termination date: 07 Nov 2001
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Mar 1993
Jorgen Cort Trap Schousboe - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1993
Termination date: 01 Nov 2000
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Mar 1993
David William Kerr - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1993
Termination date: 28 Oct 1998
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Mar 1993
Henry Alfred Holmes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Mar 1993
Termination date: 30 Oct 1996
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Mar 1993
Direct Paper Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Ambrosia Nurseries Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Eagle Direct Limited
Level 4, 60 Cashel Street
Zs Investments 2013 Limited
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street
Weeping Angels Limited
Level 2, 329 Durham Street
Interpret Geospatial Solutions Limited
Level 1, 137 Victoria Street
A M Health Limited
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street
Babycues Limited
110 Slater Street
Braided Therapies Limited
108 Stapletons Road
Gill Redden Cranio Limited
186 Bealey Avenue
Halswell Rd Clinic Limited
304 Fitzgerald Avenue
Lt Systems Limited
65 Emmett Street