Everbright Holdings Limited, a registered company, was started on 05 Aug 1993. 9429038730115 is the number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Ung Tien Lim - an active director whose contract started on 05 Aug 1993,
Ing Sung Tie - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Aug 1993 and was terminated on 26 Nov 2013,
Teck Kai Tie - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Aug 1993 and was terminated on 26 Nov 2013.
Updated on 04 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 21 Althorp Place, Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 (types include: physical, registered).
Everbright Holdings Limited had been using 21 Althorp Place, Christchurch as their physical address until 28 Nov 2014.
A total of 100000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 5000 shares (5 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 95000 shares (95 per cent).
Previous address
Address: 21 Althorp Place, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 27 Jun 1997 to 28 Nov 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 07 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Siu, Yan Chua |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 95000 | |||
Individual | Lim, Ung Tiem |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Tie, Teck Siong |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Teck Kee |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Teck Kai |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Teck Hui |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Teck Guan |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Ing Sung |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Sing Tai |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Mee, Hung Yu |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Individual | Tie, Sing Chen |
Christchurch |
05 Aug 1993 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Ung Tien Lim - Director
Appointment date: 05 Aug 1993
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Nov 2015
Ing Sung Tie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Aug 1993
Termination date: 26 Nov 2013
Address: Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 1993
Teck Kai Tie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Aug 1993
Termination date: 26 Nov 2013
Address: Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 1993
Everbright Development Limited
21 Althorp Place
Evergreen Realty Limited
21 Althorp Place
Garden Hotel Limited
21 Althorp Place
Tm And Pr Investments Limited
24 Althorp Place
Milton Takeaways Limited
27 Althorp Place
Richards Financial Services Limited
6 Priorsford Court