Rooms 2 Go (2024) Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 22 Aug 1994. 9429038705625 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Bruce Ian Humble - an active director whose contract started on 22 Aug 1994,
Rosemary Louise Humble - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 Aug 1994 and was terminated on 14 May 2021.
Updated on 06 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 67 Seddon Road, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 (category: registered, physical).
Rooms 2 Go (2024) Limited had been using 39 Thackeray Street, Hamilton as their registered address up until 07 Apr 2021.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 999 shares (99.9%) held by 2 entities. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1%).
Previous addresses
Address: 39 Thackeray Street, Hamilton New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Jul 2006 to 07 Apr 2021
Address: C/- Ken Chung, Chartered Accountant, 39 Thackeray Street, Hamilton
Physical & registered address used from 22 Aug 1994 to 31 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 23 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Ca Trustees (2020) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048011174 |
Frankton Hamilton 3204 New Zealand |
30 May 2022 - |
Individual | Humble, Bruce Ian |
Eden Park Hamilton |
24 Jul 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Humble, Bruce Ian |
Eden Park Hamilton |
24 Jul 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Humble, Rosemary Louise |
Eden Park Hamilton |
22 Aug 1994 - 30 May 2022 |
Individual | Humble, Rosemary Louise |
Eden Park Hamilton |
24 Jul 2006 - 30 May 2022 |
Individual | Humble, Bruce Ian |
Eden Park Hamilton |
22 Aug 1994 - 30 May 2022 |
Other | The Jordy Trust | 30 Jul 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Individual | Chung, Kenneth Foo Weng |
Hamilton New Zealand |
24 Jul 2006 - 26 Feb 2016 |
Other | Null - The Jordy Trust | 30 Jul 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Bruce Ian Humble - Director
Appointment date: 22 Aug 1994
Address: Rototuna North, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2015
Rosemary Louise Humble - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Aug 1994
Termination date: 14 May 2021
Address: Rototuna North, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Aug 2015
Health, Harmony And Wellbeing Limited
39 Thackeray Street
Jackel Tairua Limited
39 Thackeray Street
Nz Vehicle Finance Limited
39 Thackeray St
Stressbox Limited
39 Thackeray St
Coro Holdings Limited
39 Thackeray Street
Gibson Plumbing (hamilton) Limited
39 Thackeray Street