Maniototo Health Services Limited, a registered company, was registered on 01 Jun 1994. 9429038608902 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Hospitals (excluding psychiatric and continuing geriatric care)" (ANZSIC Q840120) is how the company is categorised. The company has been run by 29 directors: David Charles Crutchley - an active director whose contract started on 27 Mar 2002,
Stuart Keith Paterson - an active director whose contract started on 26 May 2009,
Denise Patricia Baddock - an active director whose contract started on 06 Dec 2011,
John Joseph Mulholland - an active director whose contract started on 03 Dec 2012,
Simon Dean Courtney - an active director whose contract started on 09 Dec 2020.
Updated on 06 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (category: registered, physical).
Maniototo Health Services Limited had been using 43 Pery St, Ranfurly, Otago as their registered address up to 14 Mar 2022.
A total of 32970 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (5 groups). The first group includes 500 shares (1.52%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 7500 shares (22.75%). Lastly the next share allocation (500 shares 1.52%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
41 Pery Street, Rd 3, Ranfurly, 9397 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 43 Pery St, Ranfurly, Otago, 9332 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Mar 2021 to 14 Mar 2022
Address #2: 51 Tyrone Street, Ranfurly, Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Mar 2016 to 12 Mar 2021
Address #3: 1 Tyrone Street, Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Nov 2011 to 17 Mar 2016
Address #4: Maniototo Hospital, 1 Tyrone Street, Ranfurly New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Mar 1997 to 11 Nov 2011
Address #5: C/- Maniototo Hospital, 1 Tyrone Street, Ranfurly New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Mar 1997 to 11 Nov 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 32970
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 06 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Other (Other) | Kyeburn Public Library |
Ranfurly |
01 Jun 1994 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 7500 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Maniototo Irrigation Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039321985 |
Alexandra 9320 New Zealand |
01 Jun 1994 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Gibson, Robert And Doris John And Theresa |
Ranfurly Otago 9398 New Zealand |
01 Jun 1994 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1650 | |||
Individual | Courtney, Simon Dean |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
01 Apr 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Other (Other) | Central Otago District Council |
Alexandra |
01 Jun 1994 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Maureen Cleugh | 01 Jun 1994 - 01 Apr 2015 | |
Individual | Tonkin, Philip Anthony |
Ranfurly |
01 Jun 1994 - 17 Mar 2008 |
Individual | Todd, Denis John |
Ranfurly |
01 Jun 1994 - 17 Mar 2008 |
Individual | Gibson, R J |
Ranfurly |
01 Jun 1994 - 01 Apr 2015 |
Individual | Henderson, M B | 01 Jun 1994 - 08 Mar 2013 | |
Individual | Cooney, William Thomas |
Alexandra |
01 Jun 1994 - 17 Mar 2008 |
Other | Null - Maureen Cleugh | 01 Jun 1994 - 01 Apr 2015 | |
Other | Null - Mt Ida Lodge No 97 Limited | 01 Jun 1994 - 01 Apr 2015 | |
Individual | Henderson, L T | 01 Jun 1994 - 08 Mar 2013 | |
Other | Mt Ida Lodge No 97 Limited | 01 Jun 1994 - 01 Apr 2015 | |
Individual | Greer, A W J |
Ranfurly |
01 Jun 1994 - 01 Apr 2015 |
David Charles Crutchley - Director
Appointment date: 27 Mar 2002
Address: Rd 2, Ranfurly, 9396 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Stuart Keith Paterson - Director
Appointment date: 26 May 2009
Address: Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Mar 2015
Denise Patricia Baddock - Director
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2011
Address: Ranfurly, Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Apr 2019
Address: Ranfurly, Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2011
John Joseph Mulholland - Director
Appointment date: 03 Dec 2012
Address: Rd 1, Ranfurly, 9395 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2012
Simon Dean Courtney - Director
Appointment date: 09 Dec 2020
Address: Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Dec 2020
Elizabeth Anne O'neill - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2021
Address: Rd 1, Ranfurly, 9395 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2021
Jeremy Thomas Anderson - Director
Appointment date: 30 Aug 2023
Address: Maori Hill, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Aug 2023
Joyce Lorraine Greer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Mar 2002
Termination date: 02 Jun 2023
Address: Ranfurly, Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2016
David Mark Dodd - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Nov 2007
Termination date: 09 Dec 2020
Address: Rd 1, Ranfurly, 9395 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Donald Raymond Carey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2003
Termination date: 07 Dec 2017
Address: Rd 3, Ranfurly, 9397 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Wendy Margaret Hore - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Dec 2012
Termination date: 09 Dec 2015
Address: Ranfurly, Ranfurly, 9332 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2012
Jeffrey Lawrence Cleugh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Dec 2012
Termination date: 25 Mar 2015
Address: Rd 1, Ranfurly, 9395 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2012
Leonard Errol Millar - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2011
Termination date: 17 Mar 2015
Address: Rd 4, Ranfurly, 9398 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2011
Lorraine Shirley Duncan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Dec 2012
Termination date: 16 Dec 2014
Address: Rd 1, Ranfurly, 9395 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2012
Lee Norma Hamill - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2005
Termination date: 06 Dec 2011
Address: Rd 4, Ranfurly, 9398 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Lenore Isobel Townsend - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 May 2009
Termination date: 06 Dec 2011
Address: Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 New Zealand
Address used since 26 May 2009
Gerald Francis Dowling - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jun 1994
Termination date: 30 Nov 2010
Address: Rd 3, Ranfurly, 9397 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2010
Claire Bridget Mccormick - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2005
Termination date: 30 Nov 2010
Address: Ranfurly,
Address used since 18 Oct 2005
Leonard Errol Millar - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Nov 2006
Termination date: 24 Feb 2009
Address: R D 4, Ranfurly,
Address used since 27 Nov 2006
Eric James Laurenson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2005
Termination date: 19 May 2007
Address: R D 4, Ranfurly,
Address used since 29 Nov 2005
John Whitefield Aitken - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jun 1994
Termination date: 29 Nov 2005
Address: Paerau,
Address used since 01 Jun 1994
Elizabeth Anne Mcskimming - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Mar 2002
Termination date: 18 Oct 2005
Address: Patearoa,
Address used since 27 Mar 2002
Robert John Gibson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 1994
Termination date: 30 Apr 2003
Address: Gimmerburn,
Address used since 10 Aug 1994
Enid Alice Ramage - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 1994
Termination date: 27 Mar 2002
Address: Ranfurly,
Address used since 10 Aug 1994
Zita Mary Cleugh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1995
Termination date: 27 Mar 2002
Address: Maniototo Station Road, Ranfurly,
Address used since 18 Dec 1995
Patrick Thomas Cooney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Dec 1995
Termination date: 27 Mar 2002
Address: Alexandra,
Address used since 18 Dec 1995
Verne Gullen Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 1994
Termination date: 18 Dec 1995
Address: Ranfurly,
Address used since 10 Aug 1994
Denis Michael Stumbles - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 1994
Termination date: 18 Dec 1995
Address: Ranfurly,
Address used since 10 Aug 1994
Denis John Todd - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 1994
Termination date: 25 May 1995
Address: Ranfurly,
Address used since 10 Aug 1994
Maniototo Golf Club Incorporated
Tyrone Street
Rock And Pillar Hut Trust Incorporated
9 Launceston Place
C Inder Holdings Limited
24 Knowles Crescent
B & H 2016 Limited
4 Knowles Crescent
Oturehua Water Company Limited
13 Pery Street
Graham Electrical Limited
13 Pery Street
Central Otago Health Services Limited
Level 1
Charlotte Jean Maternity Hospital Limited
Scholefield Cockroft Lloyd
Gore Health Limited
33a Main Street
Manuka Street Hospital Limited
36 Manuka Street
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
72 Newington Avenue
Waitaki District Health Services Limited
20 Eden Street