Kirkdale Investments Limited, a registered company, was registered on 27 Sep 1994. 9429038596766 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Land development or subdivision (excluding construction)" (ANZSIC E321120) is how the company was classified. This company has been managed by 10 directors: Nicholas Brian Browning Kimpton - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2011,
Michael Donald Ralph Kimpton - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2011,
Andrew James Fergy Kimpton - an active director whose contract started on 12 Sep 2011,
Carolyn Merle Kimpton Fotheringham - an active director whose contract started on 16 Sep 2020,
Amanda Margaret Kimpton Vettoretti - an active director whose contract started on 16 Sep 2020.
Updated on 10 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Unit A1, 1 North City Road, Rototuna North, Hamilton, 3210 (type: registered, physical).
Kirkdale Investments Limited had been using 2 Kimbrae Drive, Rototuna, Auckland as their registered address up until 05 May 2021.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 35510000 shares) - Kirkdale Group Limited - located at 3210, Rototuna North, Hamilton.
Principal place of activity
Unit A1, 1 North City Road, Rototuna North, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 2 Kimbrae Drive, Rototuna, Auckland, 3210 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 May 2020 to 05 May 2021
Address: 2 Kimbrae Drive, Rototuna North, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Jan 2020 to 05 May 2021
Address: 131 Wattle Farm Road, Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 May 2019 to 01 May 2020
Address: Unit 11, 9 Lynden Court, Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210 New Zealand
Physical address used from 15 Apr 2016 to 28 Jan 2020
Address: Acacia Cove Village, 131 Wattle Farm Road, Wattle Downs, Manurewa, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2016
Address: Acacia Cove Village, 131 Wattle Farm Road, Wattle Downs, Manurewa, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2007 to 02 May 2019
Address: Level 12, The Auckland Club Tower, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 07 Nov 1994 to 07 Nov 1994
Address: Level 12, The Auckland Club Tower, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 07 Nov 1994 to 12 Apr 2007
Address: Mackrell Murcott & Co., 17 Clifton Road, Hamilton
Physical address used from 07 Nov 1994 to 12 Apr 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 35510000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 11 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 35510000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Kirkdale Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047952706 |
Rototuna North Hamilton 3210 New Zealand |
02 Apr 2020 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Greyfriars Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047844261 Company Number: 7856238 |
02 Apr 2020 - 02 Apr 2020 | |
Entity | Kimpton Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033699677 Company Number: 1893976 |
02 Apr 2020 - 02 Apr 2020 | |
Entity | Kimpton Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033699677 Company Number: 1893976 |
02 Apr 2020 - 02 Apr 2020 | |
Entity | Greyfriars Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047844261 Company Number: 7856238 |
02 Apr 2020 - 02 Apr 2020 | |
Individual | Bolland, Raymond Arthur John |
Hatfields Beach Auckland |
27 Sep 1994 - 27 Feb 2008 |
Individual | Kimpton, Brian Fergy |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 New Zealand |
27 Sep 1994 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Individual | Melrose, Helen Frances |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 New Zealand |
22 Jun 2006 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Nicholas Brian Browning Kimpton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2011
Address: Rd1, Hamilton, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2011
Michael Donald Ralph Kimpton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2011
Address: Rd 1, Hamilton, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Apr 2023
Address: Rd1, Hamilton, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2011
Andrew James Fergy Kimpton - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2011
Address: Rd1, Hamilton, 3281 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Sep 2011
Carolyn Merle Kimpton Fotheringham - Director
Appointment date: 16 Sep 2020
Address: Kelburn, Wellington, 6012 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Sep 2020
Amanda Margaret Kimpton Vettoretti - Director
Appointment date: 16 Sep 2020
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Apr 2021
Address: Ellerslie, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Sep 2020
Brian Fergy Kimpton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Oct 1994
Termination date: 10 Aug 2022
Address: Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Mar 2015
Michael Thomas Tomlinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2005
Termination date: 01 May 2014
Address: Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Nov 2009
John Leslie Borsboom - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2007
Termination date: 27 Mar 2009
Address: Stanmore Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2007
Jonathan Maplesden - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Oct 1994
Termination date: 27 Sep 2005
Address: Weymouth, Auckland,
Address used since 26 Oct 1994
Gavin John Macdonald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Sep 1994
Termination date: 26 Oct 1994
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 27 Sep 1994
Chris Hallett Limited
35 Acacia Cove
Kwik-fix Holdings Limited
39 Croftview Road, Wattle Cove
Creag An Tuirc Limited
157 Wattle Farm Road
Saffron It Limited
5 Pinehurst Place
Serendipity Photography Limited
29b Muirfield Street
Gt8 Limited
10 Blackwood Drive
Bn Land Limited
24 Tarapiroe Avenue
Clevedon Road Estate Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Golden Harbor Development Limited
135 Pararekau Road
Hjt Developments Limited
33 Coles Crescent
Newinvest Management Limited
95 Hingaia Road
Q Invest Co., Limited
95 Hingaia Road