Taurangi Properties Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 13 Mar 1995. 9429038510250 is the business number it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Neil James Hendren - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 1995,
Pamela Eva Hendren - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 1995.
Updated on 20 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level , 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (types include: registered, physical).
Taurangi Properties Limited had been using Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland as their physical address up until 09 Jul 2021.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 10 shares (1 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 980 shares (98 per cent). Finally there is the 3rd share allotment (10 shares 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Aug 2010 to 09 Jul 2021
Address: Mcelroy Dutt & Thomson, Level 2, 161 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Apr 2006 to 09 Aug 2010
Address: 38 Trigg Road, Whenuapai
Physical address used from 16 Sep 1996 to 16 Sep 1996
Address: 38 Trigg Road, Whenuapai
Registered address used from 16 Sep 1996 to 13 Apr 2006
Address: 20 Tarndale Road, Albany
Physical address used from 16 Sep 1996 to 13 Apr 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 05 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Hendren, Pamela Eva |
Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
13 Jul 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 980 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | K.d. Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047336 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
13 Jul 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Hendren, Neil James |
Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
13 Jul 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hendren, Pamela Eva |
Whenuapai |
13 Mar 1995 - 30 Jul 2004 |
Individual | Hendren, Neil James |
Whenuapai |
13 Mar 1995 - 30 Jul 2004 |
Individual | Hendren, Pamela Eva |
Whenuapai |
13 Mar 1995 - 30 Jul 2004 |
Individual | Hendren, Pamela Eva |
Whenuapai |
13 Mar 1995 - 30 Jul 2004 |
Individual | Hendren, Neil James |
Whenuapai |
13 Mar 1995 - 30 Jul 2004 |
Individual | Hendren, Neil James |
35 Elizabeth Street Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
13 Mar 1995 - 30 Jul 2004 |
Neil James Hendren - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 1995
Address: Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 2010
Pamela Eva Hendren - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 1995
Address: Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jul 2010
Business In The Community (2013) Limited
Level 3, 255 Broadway
Penrose Panel And Roofing Limited
Level 2, 161 Manukau Road
Exodus Trustees Limited
Level 1, 10 Manukau Road
Marianas Capital Limited
Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket
Growingfund Investment Limited
Level 1, 169 Manukau Road
K J M Holdings Limited
Level 1, 145 Manukau Road