Conference Innovators Limited, a registered company, was started on 18 Apr 1995. 9429038482458 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Event, recreational or promotional, management" (ANZSIC N729930) is how the company is classified. The company has been run by 3 directors: Tracey Thomas - an active director whose contract began on 23 Apr 2004,
Rachel Elizabeth Cook - an active director whose contract began on 23 Nov 2012,
Megan Clare O'brien - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Apr 1995 and was terminated on 27 Feb 2012.
Updated on 15 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 228 Papanui Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (category: physical, registered).
Conference Innovators Limited had been using Suite 2, 11 Tussock Lane, Ferrymead, Christchurch as their registered address up to 18 Mar 2020.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group includes 450 shares (45%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 450 shares (45%). Finally we have the next share allocation (50 shares 5%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
Unit 2, 11 Tussock Lane, Ferrymead, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Suite 2, 11 Tussock Lane, Ferrymead, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Mar 2019 to 18 Mar 2020
Address: Level 5, 79 Cashel Street, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jul 2018 to 19 Mar 2019
Address: Level 3, 62 Worcester Boulevard, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Nov 2017 to 06 Jul 2018
Address: Unit 3, 15 Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 Feb 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
Address: Unit 3, 15 Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered address used from 07 Feb 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
Address: Unit 3, 15 Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Jun 2016 to 08 Feb 2017
Address: Unit 3, 15 Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Jun 2016 to 07 Feb 2017
Address: Unit 2, 11 Tussock Lane, Ferrymead, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 May 2014 to 13 Jun 2016
Address: 176 Fitzgerald Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Mar 2013 to 13 May 2014
Address: C/-d. Fantham (ca), Level 2, 137 Hereford Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Oct 2004 to 13 Mar 2013
Address: C/- D. Fantham, 196 Gloucester Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 06 Apr 2004 to 15 Oct 2004
Address: C/- D. Fantham, 196 Gloucester Street, Christhcurch
Physical address used from 06 Apr 2004 to 15 Oct 2004
Address: C/- D Fantham, 307 Worcester Street, Christchurch 8006
Physical address used from 07 Apr 2002 to 06 Apr 2004
Address: C/- D Fantham, 307 Worcester Street, Christhcurch 8006
Registered address used from 07 Apr 2002 to 06 Apr 2004
Address: C/o Falloon And Associates, Chartered Accountants, 6 Durham Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 03 Jun 1999 to 03 Jun 1999
Address: C/- D Fantham, 305 Worcester Street, Christchurch 8006
Physical address used from 03 Jun 1999 to 07 Apr 2002
Address: C/o Falloon And Associates, Chartered Accountants, 6 Durham Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 03 Jun 1999 to 07 Apr 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 18 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 450 | |||
Individual | Thomas, Tracey |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 450 | |||
Individual | Thomas, Patricia Margaret |
Heathcote Valley Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Cook, Rachel Elizabeth |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 May 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Brownlie, Paul John |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
08 May 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | O'brien, Peter Gerard |
Mt Pleasant Christchurch |
18 Apr 1995 - 09 Apr 2008 |
Individual | O'brien, Megan Clare |
St Andrews Hill Christchurch New Zealand |
18 Apr 1995 - 19 Nov 2012 |
Tracey Thomas - Director
Appointment date: 23 Apr 2004
Address: Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2022
Address: Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2010
Rachel Elizabeth Cook - Director
Appointment date: 23 Nov 2012
Address: Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2022
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Mar 2020
Address: Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Nov 2012
Megan Clare O'brien - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Apr 1995
Termination date: 27 Feb 2012
Address: Mt Pleasant, Christchurch,
Address used since 09 Apr 2008
Direct Paper Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Ambrosia Nurseries Limited
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street
Eagle Direct Limited
Level 4, 60 Cashel Street
Zs Investments 2013 Limited
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street
Weeping Angels Limited
Level 2, 329 Durham Street
Interpret Geospatial Solutions Limited
Level 1, 137 Victoria Street
Ame Promotions Limited
116 Marshland Road
Asylum Pro Limited
Flat 6, 19 Swanns Road
Brown Bread Limited
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street
Skylark Productions Limited
5 Hammersley Avenue
Taylored Events Limited
8 Carrington Street
White Knight Independent Limited
2-173 Chester Street East