Putaruru Motor Inn Limited, a registered company, was registered on 12 May 1995. 9429038475252 is the NZBN it was issued. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is how the company has been classified. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Wendy Ann Crawford - an active director whose contract started on 26 Mar 2014,
Garry Roland Crawford - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 May 1995 and was terminated on 19 Jun 2016,
Nancy Ann Crawford - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Feb 2003 and was terminated on 01 Aug 2006,
Wendy Ann Crawford - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 May 1995 and was terminated on 18 Aug 1997.
Last updated on 17 Sep 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 5 addresses this company uses, specifically: Building 5 Eastside, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2163 (physical address),
Building 5 Eastside, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2163 (service address),
22A Charles Street, Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 (other address),
22A Charles Street, Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 (records address) among others.
Putaruru Motor Inn Limited had been using Building 5 Eastside, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland as their physical address until 19 Mar 2021.
A total of 102 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 24 shares (23.53%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 76 shares (74.51%). Lastly the 3rd share allocation (2 shares 1.96%) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 22a Charles Street, Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Other (Address for Records) & records address (Address for Records) used from 11 Nov 2020
Address #5: Building 5 Eastside, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2163 New Zealand
Physical & service address used from 19 Mar 2021
Previous addresses
Address #1: Building 5 Eastside, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 10 Aug 2006 to 19 Mar 2021
Address #2: Building 5 Eastside, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Aug 2006 to 08 Dec 2017
Address #3: Corbett Carter, 1st Floor, 230 Great South Road, Hunters Corner, Papatoetoe
Physical address used from 05 Dec 1997 to 10 Aug 2006
Address #4: Quinn Green & Co, 129 Kolmar Road, Papatoetoe, Auckland
Registered address used from 05 Dec 1997 to 10 Aug 2006
Address #5: Quinn Green & Co, 129 Kolmar Road, Papatoetoe, Auckland
Physical address used from 05 Dec 1997 to 05 Dec 1997
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 102
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 01 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 24 | |||
Individual | Crawford, Ian Roland |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 76 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Millennium Futures Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039785565 |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
12 May 1995 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Crawford, Wendy Ann |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Crawford, Garry Roland |
Browns Bay Auckland New Zealand |
23 Dec 2003 - 01 Feb 2017 |
Wendy Ann Crawford - Director
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2014
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2020
Address: Waiake, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2014
Garry Roland Crawford - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 May 1995
Termination date: 19 Jun 2016
Address: Waiake, North Shore City, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Nov 2009
Nancy Ann Crawford - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2003
Termination date: 01 Aug 2006
Address: Takapuna, Auckland 1310,
Address used since 24 Jun 2006
Wendy Ann Crawford - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 May 1995
Termination date: 18 Aug 1997
Address: Northcote, Auckland,
Address used since 12 May 1995
Sam 88 Trustee Limited
Monteck Carter Lp
Astro Trustee Limited
15 Accent Drive
B & S Walters Trustees Limited
Monteck Carter Lp
Barry Doherty Contracting Limited
Level 1 Bldg 5 15 Accent Drive
Tech 'n' Color (nz) Limited
Eastside, 1st Floor, Building 4
Kemi Investments Limited
Level 1 Building 5 15 Accent Drive
Avondale Hotel No. 1 Limited
C/o Corbett Carter
Bruce's Place Limited
Level 1 Bldg 5
Cb & Aj Properties Limited
Level 1 Building 5 Eastside
Clae Investment Limited
C/o Forsyth & Associates Ltd
Classic Plants (1998) Limited
15 Accent Drive
Number 17 Limited
Forsyth & Associates