Needlepines Seven Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 13 May 1996. 9429038323201 is the business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Jonathan Groves Bolton - an active director whose contract began on 13 May 1996,
Susan Leslie Bolton - an active director whose contract began on 13 May 1996.
Updated on 09 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 4, 3 Ferncroft Street, Grafton, Auckkland, 1010 (category: physical, registered).
Needlepines Seven Limited had been using Battley & Johnson- Charterd Accountants, 7Th Floor, Southpac Tower, Corner Queen & Customs Str, Auckland 1 as their physical address until 07 Nov 2000.
A total of 50000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 25000 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 25000 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: Battley & Johnson- Charterd Accountants, 7th Floor, Southpac Tower, Corner Queen & Customs Str, Auckland 1
Physical address used from 07 Nov 2000 to 07 Nov 2000
Address: Battley & Johnson- Chartered Accountants, 7th Floor, Southpac Tower, Corner Queen & Customs Str, Auckland 1
Registered address used from 07 Nov 2000 to 07 Nov 2000
Address: 5th Floor, 110 Symonds Street, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Nov 2000 to 04 Sep 2012
Address: Battley & Johnson- Charterd Accountants, 7th Floor, Southpac Tower, Corner Queen & Customs Str, Auckland 1
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 07 Nov 2000
Address: Battley & Johnson- Charterd Accountants, 7th Floor, Southpac Tower, Corner Queen & Customs Str, Auckland 1
Registered address used from 12 Oct 1998 to 11 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 01 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 25000 | |||
Individual | Bolton, Susan Leslie |
Massey Auckland |
13 May 1996 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 25000 | |||
Individual | Bolton, Jonathan Groves |
Massey Auckland |
13 May 1996 - |
Jonathan Groves Bolton - Director
Appointment date: 13 May 1996
Address: Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 1996
Susan Leslie Bolton - Director
Appointment date: 13 May 1996
Address: Massey, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 1996
Horse & Trap (2013) Limited
3 Ferncroft Street
Phl Trustee Company Limited
Level 4
The Small Business Boot Camp Company Limited
Level 4
Christopher & Banks V Limited
Level 4
Christopher & Banks Limited
Level 4
Smartybags Nz Limited
Level 4