Ranui Resources Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 01 Jul 1996. 9429038290732 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been run by 6 directors: Terrence Peter Neal - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jul 1996,
Debra Anne Neal - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jul 1996,
Barbara Anne Mclean - an active director whose contract began on 18 Aug 2014,
Timothy Ward Neal - an active director whose contract began on 13 May 2015,
Edith Jean Ward - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Jul 1996 and was terminated on 16 Jul 2014.
Last updated on 25 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 46B Clifton Road, Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 (type: registered, physical).
Ranui Resources Limited had been using Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington as their registered address up to 27 May 2022.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 May 2020 to 27 May 2022
Address: Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 May 2019 to 11 May 2020
Address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 May 2019 to 24 May 2019
Address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 May 2018 to 06 May 2019
Address: Ernst & Young, Level 22, Majestic Centre, 100 Willis St, Wellington
Registered address used from 23 Mar 2001 to 23 Mar 2001
Address: 5th Floor, Westfield Tower, 45 Kinghts Road, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Mar 2001 to 31 May 2018
Address: Same As Registered Office Address
Physical address used from 23 Mar 2001 to 23 Mar 2001
Address: 5th Floor, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Mar 2001 to 31 May 2018
Address: Level 20, Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington
Physical address used from 31 Jul 2000 to 23 Mar 2001
Address: Level 20 Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington
Registered address used from 31 Jul 2000 to 23 Mar 2001
Address: 3rd Floor, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
Address: Level 20, Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington
Physical address used from 08 May 1997 to 31 Jul 2000
Address: 3rd Floor, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington
Physical address used from 01 Apr 1997 to 08 May 1997
Address: 3rd Floor, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington
Registered address used from 06 Aug 1996 to 11 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 08 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Neal, Debra Anne |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
01 Jul 1996 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Neal, Terrence Peter |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
01 Jul 1996 - |
Terrence Peter Neal - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 1996
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Aug 2014
Debra Anne Neal - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 1996
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Aug 2014
Barbara Anne Mclean - Director
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2014
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Aug 2014
Timothy Ward Neal - Director
Appointment date: 13 May 2015
Address: Melbourne, Victoria, 3004 Australia
Address used since 13 May 2015
Edith Jean Ward - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Jul 1996
Termination date: 16 Jul 2014
Address: Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 1996
Garth Osmond Melville - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 1996
Termination date: 12 Jul 1996
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Jul 1996
Dr Group (nz) Limited
Lvl 21 Majestic Centre
Summerset Villages (dunedin) Limited
Level 27
Summerset Villages (hamilton) Limited
Level 27
Welhom Developments Limited
Level 27