Sit & Blake Limited, a registered company, was launched on 01 Nov 1996. 9429038220722 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Christopher Chee Kin Sit - an active director whose contract began on 01 Nov 1996,
James Felix Blake - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Nov 1996 and was terminated on 01 Jun 1998,
Seung Hoon Lee - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Nov 1996 and was terminated on 17 Jan 1997.
Last updated on 02 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 97 Great South Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1051 (category: registered, physical).
Sit & Blake Limited had been using 280 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland as their physical address up until 06 Aug 2021.
Previous names used by this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 01 Nov 1996 to 16 Jan 1997 they were called Sit Blake Lee Limited.
A total of 21000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 16800 shares (80%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 4200 shares (20%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 280 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 Jul 2020 to 06 Aug 2021
Address #2: 280 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Jul 2015 to 09 Aug 2021
Address #3: 280 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2015
Address #4: Nair & Associates Chartered Accountants, 280 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Jul 2005 to 21 Jul 2011
Address #5: 351 A Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 22 Jul 2005 to 27 Jul 2020
Address #6: Nair & Associates Ltd, 102 Balmoral Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 09 Aug 2004 to 22 Jul 2005
Address #7: Foley Quarry Road, R D 2, Albany, Auckland
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 09 Aug 2004
Address #8: 31 Henley Road, Mt Eden
Registered address used from 03 Apr 2000 to 11 Apr 2000
Address #9: 31 Henley Road, Mt Eden
Physical address used from 03 Apr 2000 to 03 Apr 2000
Address #10: Virginia Gomes & Associates, 3/889 Mt Eden Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Physical address used from 03 Apr 2000 to 09 Aug 2004
Address #11: Foley Quarry Road, R D 2, Albany, Auckland
Registered address used from 05 Dec 1998 to 03 Apr 2000
Address #12: Foley Quarry Road, Albany, Auckland
Physical address used from 05 Dec 1998 to 03 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 21000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 22 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 16800 | |||
Individual | Sit, Christopher Chee Kin |
Remuera Auckland |
01 Nov 1996 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 4200 | |||
Individual | Low, Maggie Shu Men |
Remuera Auckland |
01 Nov 1996 - |
Christopher Chee Kin Sit - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1996
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 1996
James Felix Blake - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1996
Termination date: 01 Jun 1998
Address: R D 2, Albany, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Nov 1996
Seung Hoon Lee - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 1996
Termination date: 17 Jan 1997
Address: Glenfield, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Nov 1996
Roy B L Holdings Limited
280 Great South Road
Team Robert Elite Limited
280 Great South Road
World Food Limited
280 Great South Road
Bribyn Holdings Limited
280 Great South Road
Overall Contractors Limited
280 Great South Road
29 Queen Street Properties Limited
280 Great South Road