2Bob Investments Limited was launched on 23 Jul 1997 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038048128. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: David Kevin Smith - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jul 1997,
Brett William Dean - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jul 1997,
John Bannerman Dewar - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jul 1997 and was terminated on 16 Mar 2018.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 15 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: 321 Grenada Street, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 (type: registered, service).
Until 02 Sep 2014, 2Bob Investments Limited had been using Bdo Tauranga Ltd, 96 Cameron Rd, Tauranga 3110 as their registered address.
BizDb found past names for this company: from 23 Jul 1997 to 11 Mar 2022 they were named Bay Providors Limited.
A total of 300 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 150 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Dean, Brett Williams (an individual) located at Tauranga.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 150 shares) and includes
Smith, David Kevin - located at Papamoa. 2Bob Investments Limited was classified as "Building, non-residential - renting or leasing" (ANZSIC L671210).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Bdo Tauranga Ltd, 96 Cameron Rd, Tauranga 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Dec 2009 to 02 Sep 2014
Address #2: Bdo Spicers Tauranga Ltd, 273 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 30 Aug 2007 to 14 Dec 2009
Address #3: Simmonds Cooney Lellman, 273 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 24 Aug 2000 to 30 Aug 2007
Address #4: 52a Judea Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 24 Aug 2000
Address #5: Simmonds & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 12 Elizabeth Street, Tauranga
Registered address used from 15 Jul 1999 to 11 Apr 2000
Address #6: Simmonds Cooney Lellman Ltd, 273 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Physical address used from 08 Aug 1998 to 30 Aug 2007
Address #7: Simmonds Cooney Lellman, 273 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Physical address used from 08 Aug 1998 to 08 Aug 1998
Address #8: Simmonds & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 12 Elizabeth Street, Tauranga
Physical address used from 08 Aug 1998 to 08 Aug 1998
Address #9: 52a Judea Road, Tauranga
Physical address used from 08 Aug 1998 to 08 Aug 1998
Address #10: 52a Judea Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 08 Aug 1998 to 15 Jul 1999
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 300
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 07 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 150 | |||
Individual | Dean, Brett Williams |
Tauranga |
23 Jul 1997 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 150 | |||
Individual | Smith, David Kevin |
Papamoa |
23 Jul 1997 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Dewar, John Bannerman |
Mount Albert Auckland |
23 Jul 1997 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Dewar, Angela Martina |
Mount Albert Auckland |
23 Jul 1997 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Entity | Ql Corporate Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034801307 Company Number: 1627250 |
271 St Heliers Bay Road St Heliers, Auckland Null New Zealand |
27 Jun 2011 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Entity | Ql Corporate Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034801307 Company Number: 1627250 |
271 St Heliers Bay Road St Heliers, Auckland Null New Zealand |
27 Jun 2011 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Dewar, John Bannerman |
Mount Albert Auckland |
23 Jul 1997 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Dewar, Angela Martina |
Mount Albert Auckland |
23 Jul 1997 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Individual | Macqueen, James Lawry |
Mount Albert Auckland |
23 Jul 1997 - 27 Jun 2011 |
David Kevin Smith - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jul 1997
Address: Papamoa, Tauranga, 3118 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
Brett William Dean - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jul 1997
Address: Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Aug 2011
John Bannerman Dewar - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jul 1997
Termination date: 16 Mar 2018
Address: Rd 6, Warkworth, 0986 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
The Artgame Limited
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road
Mcknight Medical Limited
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road
The Maples (head Office) Limited
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road
Ocean View Sports Mount Limited
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road
Bdo Tauranga Limited
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road
Clm Trustees (benes) Limited
Level 3, 247 Cameron Road
A & K Childcare Brookfield Limited
Fraser Accounting Limited
Cyber Limited
4 Willow Street
Fraser142 Limited
Fraser Accounting Limited
Gold Town Holdings Limited
Level 1, 247 Cameron Road
Goldtown Holdings No 1 Limited
Level 1, 247 Cameron Road
Resort Storage Limited
6 Durham Street