M & U Fleming Limited, a registered company, was started on 24 Jul 1997. 9429038047800 is the number it was issued. "House painting" (ANZSIC E324410) is how the company is classified. The company has been run by 2 directors: Michael Hewitt Fleming - an active director whose contract started on 24 Jul 1997,
Una Elizabeth Fleming - an inactive director whose contract started on 24 Jul 1997 and was terminated on 31 Oct 2000.
Updated on 07 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 6 Buckeye Grove, Outram, Outram, 9019 (category: registered, physical).
M & U Fleming Limited had been using 2 Duke Street, Mosgiel, Mosgiel as their physical address up to 16 Dec 2021.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Principal place of activity
2 Duke Street, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 2 Duke Street, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Apr 2020 to 16 Dec 2021
Address: 38 Ashmore Crescent, Warkworth, 0910 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Aug 2009 to 29 Apr 2020
Address: 38 Ashmore Crescent, Warkworth, 0910 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Aug 2009 to 29 Apr 2020
Address: Dcl Limited, Hallmark Building, Hillary Square, Orewa
Registered address used from 20 Mar 2006 to 06 Aug 2009
Address: Dcl Limited, Hallmark Building, Hillary Square, Orewa
Physical address used from 20 Mar 2006 to 07 Aug 2009
Address: C/- Michael Sharp & Associates, 3 Elizabeth Street, Warkworth
Registered address used from 24 Jan 2001 to 20 Mar 2006
Address: C/- Michael Sharp & Associates, 3 Elizabeth Street, Warkworth
Physical address used from 24 Jan 2001 to 24 Jan 2001
Address: M A Sharp & Associates, 17 Neville Street, Warkworth
Physical address used from 24 Jan 2001 to 20 Mar 2006
Address: C/- Michael Sharp & Associates, 3 Elizabeth Street, Warkworth
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 24 Jan 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 05 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Fleming, Michael Hewitt |
Outram Outram 9019 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Fleming, Una Elizabeth |
Outram Outram 9019 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2004 - |
Michael Hewitt Fleming - Director
Appointment date: 24 Jul 1997
Address: Outram, Outram, 9019 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2022
Address: Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2020
Address: Warkworth, Rodney, 0910 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 2014
Una Elizabeth Fleming - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jul 1997
Termination date: 31 Oct 2000
Address: Rd 1, Warkworth,
Address used since 24 Jul 1997
Rr & Hc Jones Properties Limited
47 Ashmore Crescent
Office Girls Limited
25 Northwood Close
Jth Investments Limited
17 Northwood Close
The Truck And Machinery Show Limited
25 Northwood Close
East Coast Motorcycles Nz Limited
76 Matakana Road
R And M Ward Trustee Limited
5 Matakana Road
Leigh Painters Limited
36 Hauraki Road
Premium Painters Limited
11 Wainoni Place
Timbertech (2010) Limited
23 Neville Street
Vision Painters Limited
60 Percy Street
Wafer Painting Limited
35 Hillcrest Road
Wellsford Painters Limited
3 John Andrew Drive