Helmores Limited, a registered company, was launched on 27 Nov 1997. 9429037950606 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Solicitor" (ANZSIC M693145) is how the company was classified. The company has been run by 6 directors: Peter Joseph O'dea - an active director whose contract started on 12 May 2014,
Peter Brendon Wyllie - an inactive director whose contract started on 12 May 2014 and was terminated on 19 Oct 2018,
Kerry Richard Ayers - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Nov 1997 and was terminated on 12 May 2014,
Jonathan Douglas Gillard - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Nov 1997 and was terminated on 23 May 2000,
Malcolm John Stewart-Wallace - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Nov 1997 and was terminated on 23 May 2000.
Updated on 06 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company uses, specifically: 255 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (physical address),
255 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (registered address),
255 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (service address),
Po Box 8370, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8440 (postal address) among others.
Helmores Limited had been using 38 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch as their registered address up to 30 Nov 2020.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - O'dea, Peter Joseph - located at 8011, Yaldhurst, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
38 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 38 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2020
Address #2: 23 Ennerdale Row, Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Aug 2011 to 04 Sep 2012
Address #3: Helmore Ayers, Level 4, Langwood House, 90 Armagh Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Feb 2001 to 11 Aug 2011
Address #4: Anderson Lloyd, Level 9, Otago House, Corner Moray Place & Princes Str, Dunedin
Registered address used from 28 Feb 2001 to 28 Feb 2001
Address #5: Anderson Lloyd , Level 14, Price Waterhouse Coopers Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 14 Sep 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
Address #6: Anderson Lloyd, Level 14, Price Waterhouse Coopers Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 14 Sep 2000 to 14 Sep 2000
Address #7: Anderson Lloyd, Level 9, Otago House, Corner Moray Place & Princes Str, Dunedin
Physical address used from 14 Sep 2000 to 14 Sep 2000
Address #8: Helmore Ayers, Level 4, Langwood House, 90 Armagh Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Sep 2000 to 11 Aug 2011
Address #9: Helmore Macdonald & Stanley, Level 2, 137 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 25 Aug 2000 to 14 Sep 2000
Address #10: Same As Registered Office
Physical address used from 25 Aug 2000 to 14 Sep 2000
Address #11: Helmore Macdonald & Stanley, Level 2, 137 Armagh Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 25 Aug 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 05 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | O'dea, Peter Joseph |
Yaldhurst Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wyllie, Peter Brendon |
Rolleston Rolleston 7614 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2014 - 19 Oct 2018 |
Individual | Ayers, Kerry Richard |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
27 Nov 1997 - 09 Jul 2014 |
Peter Joseph O'dea - Director
Appointment date: 12 May 2014
Address: Yaldhurst, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Aug 2016
Peter Brendon Wyllie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 May 2014
Termination date: 19 Oct 2018
Address: Rolleston, Rolleston, 7614 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jul 2016
Kerry Richard Ayers - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Nov 1997
Termination date: 12 May 2014
Address: Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2011
Jonathan Douglas Gillard - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Nov 1997
Termination date: 23 May 2000
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 27 Nov 1997
Malcolm John Stewart-wallace - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Nov 1997
Termination date: 23 May 2000
Address: 204 St Asaph Street, Christchurch,
Address used since 27 Nov 1997
Jeffrey Bernard Kenny - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Nov 1997
Termination date: 23 May 2000
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 27 Nov 1997
Walnut Tree Property Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
Pegasus Pharmacy Practice Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
Rea Investments Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
Execinsitu Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
Pink Sugar Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
Wright Wire Electrical Limited
38 Birmingham Drive
A. B. Lawyers Trustee Services Limited
3 Hamilton Avenue
Bond Street Trustees (2010) Limited
6 Hazeldean Road
Ebborn Law Limited
283 Lincoln Road
Gcl Trustees No 14 Limited
Unit 8, 27 Tyne Street
K & A Trustees (2005) Limited
119 Blenheim Road
Maclean Trustees (2018) Limited
5th Floor State Insurance Building