West Auckland Vehicle Storage Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 15 Jan 1998. 9429037942823 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been supervised by 1 director, named Michael John Ironside - an active director whose contract began on 15 Jan 1998.
Updated on 14 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 175 Access Road, Rd 1, Kumeu, 0891 (type: registered, physical).
West Auckland Vehicle Storage Limited had been using 21 Bruce Mclaren Road, Henderson, Auckland as their registered address until 17 Feb 2021.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 1 share (0.1%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 999 shares (99.9%).
Previous addresses
Address: 21 Bruce Mclaren Road, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Aug 2018 to 17 Feb 2021
Address: 9 Southgate Place, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Apr 2012 to 20 Aug 2018
Address: 661 Ararimu Valley Road, Waimauku, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Jan 2006 to 05 Apr 2012
Address: Walker Dick & Associates, 24 Veronica Street, New Lynn, Auckland
Registered address used from 11 Nov 2003 to 24 Jan 2006
Address: 24 Veronica Street, New Lynn, Auckland
Physical address used from 11 Nov 2003 to 24 Jan 2006
Address: C/- Herbert & Associates Ltd, Chartered, Accountants, Unit M, 40-42, Constellation Dr, Mairangi Bay
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jul 2003 to 11 Nov 2003
Address: C/- Herbert & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 221 Shakespeare Road, Takapuna, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 01 Jul 2003
Address: C/- Herbert & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 221 Shakespeare Road, Takapuna, Auckland
Physical address used from 16 Jan 1998 to 01 Jul 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 28 Mar 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Trigg, Cathryn Louise |
Rd 1 Kumeu 0891 New Zealand |
08 Mar 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Individual | Ironside, Michael John |
Rd 1 Kumeu 0891 New Zealand |
15 Jan 1998 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Sandilands, Julie Mary Frances |
Albany Auckland |
18 Nov 2006 - 15 Feb 2007 |
Michael John Ironside - Director
Appointment date: 15 Jan 1998
Address: Rd 1, Kumeu, 0891 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2012
Rumina Natural Care Limited
9 Southgate Place
Mustang Trustee Limited
51 Keeling Road
Northern Scaffolding Limited
33 Keeling Road
N Holdings Limited
33 Keeling Road
Commodore Properties Limited
Suite H1, 29 Keeling Road
Quality Wood Floors Limited
G1/29 Keeling Road