Peace Of Mind Securities Limited, a registered company, was launched on 28 Jan 1998. 9429037920579 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Paul Clifford Ellington - an active director whose contract began on 09 Mar 1998,
Stephen Wood - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 Jan 1998 and was terminated on 15 Aug 2000.
Last updated on 16 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 220 King Street, Rangiora, 7400 (types include: registered, physical).
Peace Of Mind Securities Limited had been using Anderson & Associates (Canterbury) Ltd, 29 High Street, Rangiora, 7440 as their physical address up until 23 Apr 2014.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Elington, Paul Clifford - located at 7400, Schnapper Rock, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: Anderson & Associates (canterbury) Ltd, 29 High Street, Rangiora, 7440 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Apr 2009 to 23 Apr 2014
Address: C/- Adair Anderson Ltd, 211 High Street, Rangiora
Physical & registered address used from 04 Sep 2002 to 06 Apr 2009
Address: C/- B F Adair, 211 High Street, Rangiora
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 04 Sep 2002
Address: C/- B F Adair, 211 High Street, Rangiora
Physical address used from 28 Jan 1998 to 04 Sep 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 17 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Elington, Paul Clifford |
Schnapper Rock Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
28 Jan 1998 - |
Paul Clifford Ellington - Director
Appointment date: 09 Mar 1998
Address: Schnapper Rock, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2021
Address: Albany, North Shore City, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2010
Stephen Wood - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Jan 1998
Termination date: 15 Aug 2000
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 28 Jan 1998
Abacus Chartered Accountants Limited
220 King Street
Radha Limited
220 King Street
A Pearce Brick & Block Limited
220 King Street
Rjp Electrical Limited
220 King Street
Lines Trustee Limited
220 King Street
Bains Classic Motor House Limited
220 King Street