G6 Kiwi Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 20 Feb 1998. 9429037916244 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 24 directors: Mark Leslie Hume - an active director whose contract began on 24 Mar 2003,
Colin Edward David Davies - an active director whose contract began on 19 Feb 2020,
Phillippa Margaret Wright - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jan 2024,
Karen Roche - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Jul 2010 and was terminated on 31 Dec 2023,
Mark Lionel William Gardiner - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jun 2008 and was terminated on 14 Feb 2022.
Updated on 30 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 4 Prospect Drive, Rd 2, Katikati, 3178 (type: registered, physical).
G6 Kiwi Limited had been using C/-Hume Pack-N-Cool Ltd, 4 Prospect Drive, Katikati as their registered address up until 07 May 2015.
A total of 50000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (4 groups). The first group consists of 19905 shares (39.81%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 7719 shares (15.44%). Finally we have the 3rd share allocation (14376 shares 28.75%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: C/-hume Pack-n-cool Ltd, 4 Prospect Drive, Katikati, 3178 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Aug 2010 to 07 May 2015
Address: C/-hume Pack-n-cool Ltd, 4 Prospect Drive, Katikati, 3178 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Aug 2010 to 07 May 2015
Address: C/-hume Pack N Cool, Prospect Drive Katikati New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Jul 2009 to 09 Aug 2010
Address: C/-hume Pack N Cool, Prospect Drive, Katikati New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Jul 2009 to 06 Aug 2010
Address: 195 Devonport Rd, Tauranga
Physical address used from 16 Jul 2005 to 17 Jul 2009
Address: 190b Commerce Lane, Mt Maunganui
Registered address used from 16 Jul 2005 to 17 Jul 2009
Address: 195 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 27 Jan 2004 to 16 Jul 2005
Address: C/- Direct Management Services, 2nd Floor Realty House, Cnr Wharf And Durham Streets, Tauranga
Registered address used from 03 Aug 2000 to 27 Jan 2004
Address: C/- Direct Management Services, 2nd Floor Realty House, Cnr Wharf And Durham Streets, Tauranga
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 03 Aug 2000
Address: P O Box 13 210, Tauranga, , Aaaah8aakaaawtyaaz
Physical address used from 23 Feb 1998 to 23 Feb 1998
Address: Realty House, Durham Street, Tauranga
Physical address used from 23 Feb 1998 to 23 Feb 1998
Address: C/- Direct Management Services, 2nd Floor Realty House, Cnr Wharf And Durham Streets, Tauranga
Physical address used from 23 Feb 1998 to 23 Feb 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 19905 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Hume Pack-n-cool Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039984494 |
Rd 2 Katikati 3178 New Zealand |
20 Feb 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 7719 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Birchwood Packhouse Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039656827 |
60 Durham Street Tauranga |
20 Feb 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 14376 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Punchbowl Packco Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031763752 |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
26 Jul 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 8000 | |||
Other (Other) | Whitehall Fruitpackers Ltd |
Rd4 Cambridge |
26 Jun 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Dms Progrowers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039050014 Company Number: 526044 |
20 Feb 1998 - 26 Jun 2008 | |
Other | Orangewood Limited |
R D 1 Kerikeri |
08 Mar 2005 - 21 Oct 2022 |
Entity | Cms Logistics Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037863609 Company Number: 904222 |
08 Jun 2006 - 26 Jun 2008 | |
Entity | Kerikeri Cold Storage Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032156560 Company Number: 110149 |
20 Apr 2007 - 02 Feb 2016 | |
Entity | Traypac Growers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037040567 Company Number: 1109577 |
20 Feb 1998 - 11 Jul 2005 | |
Entity | Punchbowl Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039239969 Company Number: 463235 |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
20 Feb 1998 - 16 Aug 2021 |
Entity | Turners And Growers Horticulture Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034307441 Company Number: 1767528 |
Mt Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
02 Feb 2016 - 25 Oct 2019 |
Other | Orangewood Limited |
R D 1 Kerikeri |
08 Mar 2005 - 21 Oct 2022 |
Other | Orangewood Limited |
R D 1 Kerikeri |
08 Mar 2005 - 21 Oct 2022 |
Other | Orangewood Limited |
R D 1 Kerikeri |
08 Mar 2005 - 21 Oct 2022 |
Entity | Punchbowl Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039239969 Company Number: 463235 |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
20 Feb 1998 - 16 Aug 2021 |
Entity | Punchbowl Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039239969 Company Number: 463235 |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
20 Feb 1998 - 16 Aug 2021 |
Entity | Turners And Growers Horticulture Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034307441 Company Number: 1767528 |
Mt Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
02 Feb 2016 - 25 Oct 2019 |
Entity | Dms Progrowers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039050014 Company Number: 526044 |
20 Feb 1998 - 26 Jun 2008 | |
Entity | Opotiki Packing And Cool Storage Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039506870 Company Number: 374655 |
20 Feb 1998 - 08 Mar 2005 | |
Entity | Trevelyan Fruit Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037416171 Company Number: 1005430 |
20 Feb 1998 - 26 Jun 2008 | |
Entity | Traypac Growers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037040567 Company Number: 1109577 |
20 Feb 1998 - 11 Jul 2005 | |
Entity | Kerikeri Cold Storage Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032156560 Company Number: 110149 |
20 Apr 2007 - 02 Feb 2016 | |
Entity | Cms Logistics Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037863609 Company Number: 904222 |
08 Jun 2006 - 26 Jun 2008 | |
Entity | Opotiki Packing And Cool Storage Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039506870 Company Number: 374655 |
20 Feb 1998 - 08 Mar 2005 | |
Entity | Eleos Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037942199 Company Number: 888590 |
20 Feb 1998 - 08 Mar 2005 | |
Entity | Trevelyan Fruit Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037416171 Company Number: 1005430 |
20 Feb 1998 - 26 Jun 2008 | |
Individual | Hume, Mark Leslie |
R D 2 Kati Kati |
01 Sep 2009 - 01 Sep 2009 |
Entity | Eleos Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037942199 Company Number: 888590 |
20 Feb 1998 - 08 Mar 2005 | |
Entity | Punchbowl Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039239969 Company Number: 463235 |
Rd 4 Pukekohe 2679 New Zealand |
20 Feb 1998 - 16 Aug 2021 |
Mark Leslie Hume - Director
Appointment date: 24 Mar 2003
Address: Rd 2, Katikati, 3178 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
Colin Edward David Davies - Director
Appointment date: 19 Feb 2020
Address: Rd 4, Pukekohe, 2679 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Feb 2020
Phillippa Margaret Wright - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jan 2024
Address: Mt. Maunganui, 3166 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2024
Karen Roche - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jul 2010
Termination date: 31 Dec 2023
Address: Rd3, Katikati, 3170 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
Mark Lionel William Gardiner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jun 2008
Termination date: 14 Feb 2022
Address: Rd4, Cambridge, 3496 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
Todd Blair Jackson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Oct 2019
Termination date: 01 Oct 2021
Address: Rd 2, Waipapa, 0295 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Oct 2019
Robert Lindsay Craig - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Feb 1998
Termination date: 19 Feb 2020
Address: R D 4, Pukekohe, 2679 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
Carl James Muller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Feb 2006
Termination date: 02 Oct 2019
Address: Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
Suzanne Francis Willetts - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Feb 2009
Termination date: 12 Jun 2019
Address: Kerikeri, 0294 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
Graeme James Blackstock - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Mar 2007
Termination date: 29 Jul 2010
Address: Rd1, Katikati,
Address used since 23 Mar 2007
John Garland Burke - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2006
Termination date: 14 Apr 2010
Address: Tauranga,
Address used since 01 Mar 2006
Alister John Hawkey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 1999
Termination date: 07 Sep 2009
Address: R D 8, Te Puke,
Address used since 01 Apr 1999
Craig Stuart Greenlees - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Feb 1998
Termination date: 04 Sep 2009
Address: R D 6, Omokoroa, Tauranga,
Address used since 20 Feb 1998
David Herbert Callagher - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2007
Termination date: 18 Nov 2008
Address: Rd3, Kerikeri,
Address used since 20 Mar 2007
Gijsbert Martinus Van Heuckelum - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2004
Termination date: 28 Feb 2007
Address: Rd1, Katikati,
Address used since 16 Dec 2004
Ricky Darryl Limmer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Jan 2005
Termination date: 11 Jun 2006
Address: Rd3, Tauranga,
Address used since 27 Jan 2005
Raymond Leonard Hodge - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2004
Termination date: 10 Nov 2005
Address: Paihia,
Address used since 18 Feb 2004
Leslie James Anstis - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2003
Termination date: 14 Feb 2005
Address: Rd3, Tauranga,
Address used since 03 Nov 2003
Ian James Craig - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Feb 1998
Termination date: 27 Jan 2005
Address: R D 1, Opotiki,
Address used since 20 Feb 1998
Graham Joseph Wiggins - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Mar 2003
Termination date: 27 Jan 2005
Address: R D 3, Tauranga,
Address used since 24 Mar 2003
Karen Glenda Pickford - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Mar 2003
Termination date: 16 Dec 2004
Address: R D 2, Katikati,
Address used since 24 Mar 2003
Jan Bosch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Feb 1998
Termination date: 03 Nov 2003
Address: Paengaroa, Te Puke,
Address used since 20 Feb 1998
Anthony Edward De Farias - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Feb 1998
Termination date: 01 Apr 1999
Address: R D 6, Te Puke,
Address used since 20 Feb 1998
John Garland Burke - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Feb 1998
Termination date: 01 Apr 1999
Address: Tauranga,
Address used since 20 Feb 1998
Tetley Coolstores Nominees Limited
4 Prospect Drive
G6 Logistics Holdings Limited
4 Prospect Drive
Prospect Fencourt Limited
4 Prospect Drive
G6 Kiwi Supply Limited
4 Prospect Drive
Prospect Kiwi Limited
4 Prospect Drive
Kiwihume Company Limited
4 Prospect Drive