E B Dorman Limited was registered on 14 Apr 1998 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037866037. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Edwin Brennian Dorman - an active director whose contract started on 20 Jul 1999,
Clifford Rex Jones - an inactive director whose contract started on 14 Apr 1998 and was terminated on 20 Jul 1999.
As stated in BizDb's data (last updated on 22 Jul 2020), this company uses 1 address: 123B Dominion Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: registered, physical).
Up until 06 Aug 2001, E B Dorman Limited had been using Ground Floor, 83 Grafton Road, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb found more names used by this company: from 14 Apr 1998 to 11 Aug 1999 they were called Ibera Holdings Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 3 groups (5 shareholders in total). In the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Edwin Dorman (an individual) located at Epsom, Auckland.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Jan Serra - located at Epsom, Auckland.
The third share allotment (998 shares, 99.8%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Edwin Dorman, located at Epsom, Auckland (an individual),
Clifford Jones, located at Lynfield, Auckland (an individual),
Jan Serra, located at Epsom, Auckland (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: Ground Floor, 83 Grafton Road, Auckland
Registered address used from 06 Aug 2001 to 06 Aug 2001
Address: Same As Above
Physical address used from 06 Aug 2001 to 06 Aug 2001
Address: Offices Of Clifford R Jones, Chartered Accountant, Ground Floor, 83 Grafton Road, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 06 Aug 2001
Address: Offices Of Clifford R Jones, Chartered Accountant, Ground Floor, 83 Grafton Road, Auckland
Physical address used from 01 Dec 1999 to 06 Aug 2001
Address: Offices Of Clifford R Jones, Chartered Accountant, Ground Floor, 83 Grafton Road, Auckland
Registered address used from 01 Dec 1999 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 03 Feb 2020
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Edwin Brennian Dorman |
Epsom Auckland |
14 Apr 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Jan Serra |
Epsom Auckland |
14 Apr 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 998 | |||
Individual | Edwin Dorman |
Epsom Auckland |
14 Apr 1998 - |
Individual | Clifford Rex Jones |
Lynfield Auckland |
14 Apr 1998 - |
Individual | Jan Eileen Serra |
Epsom Auckland |
14 Apr 1998 - |
Edwin Brennian Dorman - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jul 1999
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jul 1999
Clifford Rex Jones - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Apr 1998
Termination date: 20 Jul 1999
Address: Lynfield, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Apr 1998
Pacific Mc Group Limited
123b Dominion Road
Hti Limited
123e Dominion Road
Hope Emmanuel Limited
123a Dominion Road
Clifford R Jones Limited
123 B Dominion Road
Inventive Solutions Limited
123b Dominion Road
Animal Solutions Limited
123 B Dominion Road