Stornaway Farm Limited, a registered company, was registered on 26 Jun 1998. 9429037819019 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Mary Veronica Mulligan - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jun 1998,
Mark Edgar Mulligan - an active director whose contract began on 29 Jun 1998.
Last updated on 17 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, 45 Heaton Street, Timaru, 7910 (types include: physical, registered).
Stornaway Farm Limited had been using 5/45 Heaton Street, Timaru as their physical address up to 15 Feb 2019.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Vincent, Robert Howard - located at 7910, Timaru.
Previous addresses
Address: 5/45 Heaton Street, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Dec 2017 to 15 Feb 2019
Address: 104 Sophia Street, Timaru, 7910 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Mar 2014 to 11 Dec 2017
Address: 100-104 Sophia Street, Timaru New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Jan 2006 to 05 Mar 2014
Address: C/- Woodnorth Joyce, 98 King Street, Temuka
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 12 Jan 2006
Address: C/- Woodnorth Joyce, 98 King Street, Temuka
Physical address used from 29 Jun 1998 to 12 Jan 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 11 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Vincent, Robert Howard |
Timaru 7910 New Zealand |
26 Jun 1998 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mulligan, Mark Edgar |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 New Zealand |
26 Jun 1998 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Individual | Mulligan, Mark Edgar |
Rd 21 Geraldine |
26 Jun 1998 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Individual | Mulligan, Mark Edgar |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 New Zealand |
26 Jun 1998 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Individual | Mulligan, Mary Veronica |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 New Zealand |
26 Jun 1998 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Individual | Mulligan, Mary Veronica |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 New Zealand |
26 Jun 1998 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Individual | Mulligan, Mary Veronica |
Rd 21 Geraldine |
26 Jun 1998 - 25 Feb 2014 |
Mary Veronica Mulligan - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jun 1998
Address: Rd 21, Geraldine, 7991 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Feb 2014
Mark Edgar Mulligan - Director
Appointment date: 29 Jun 1998
Address: Rd 21, Geraldine, 7991 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Feb 2014
Adapt Data Solutions Limited
5/45 Heaton Street
Kieran Chamberlain Building Limited
5/45 Heaton Street
Living Developers Limited
5/45 Heaton Street
Burnlea Holdings Limited
5/45 Heaton Street
Adapt Solutions Limited
5/45 Heaton Street
Baxter Farms Limited
5/45 Heaton Street