Road To Recovery Limited was started on 04 Aug 1998 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037789220. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Rebecca Frances Loader - an active director whose contract began on 04 Aug 1998,
Tanya Suzanne Drummond - an inactive director whose contract began on 04 Aug 1998 and was terminated on 04 Aug 1998.
According to our data (updated on 25 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 124 Ashworth Bush Road, Sefton, Sefton, 7477 (category: physical, registered).
Until 11 Oct 2021, Road To Recovery Limited had been using 106 Mohaka Street, Wainuiomata, Lower Hutt as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Loader, Rebecca Frances (an individual) located at Sefton postcode 7477. Road To Recovery Limited has been categorised as "Professional, scientific and technical services nec" (ANZSIC M699945).
Principal place of activity
106 Mohaka Street, Wainuiomata, Lower Hutt, 5014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 106 Mohaka Street, Wainuiomata, Lower Hutt, 5014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Dec 2012 to 11 Oct 2021
Address: 12 Meremere Street, Wainuiomata, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Dec 2001 to 11 Dec 2012
Address: 118 Mcleod Street, Upper Hutt
Physical address used from 14 Dec 2001 to 14 Dec 2001
Address: 12 Meremere Street, Wainuiomata New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Dec 2001 to 11 Dec 2012
Address: 118 Mcleod Street, Upper Hutt
Registered address used from 18 Apr 2001 to 14 Dec 2001
Address: 61 Thatcher Crescent, Crofton Downs
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 18 Apr 2001
Address: 61 Thatcher Crescent, Crofton Downs
Physical address used from 30 Jun 1999 to 14 Dec 2001
Address: 61 Thatcher Crescent, Crofton Downs
Registered address used from 30 Jun 1999 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 06 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Loader, Rebecca Frances |
Sefton 7477 New Zealand |
04 Aug 1998 - |
Rebecca Frances Loader - Director
Appointment date: 04 Aug 1998
Address: Sefton, 7477 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2021
Address: Wainuiomata, Lower Hutt, 5014 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Dec 2011
Tanya Suzanne Drummond - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Aug 1998
Termination date: 04 Aug 1998
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 04 Aug 1998
Lower North Island Red Deer Foundation Incorporated
106 Mohaka Street
Mulmahunag Limited
2 Sun Valley Way
Q & E Services Limited
9 Sun Valley Grove
P & N Wilson Investment Properties Limited
3 Sun Valley Grove
Gateways Society
18 Kaponga Street
Classic Decorators Limited
45 Momona Street
Agile Learning New Zealand Limited
33 Grimsby Grove
Currie Group (nz) Limited
162 Gracefield
Elevator Technical Services Limited
44 Norton Park Avenue
Gfb Commercial Limited
21 Miles Crescent
Project 2010 Limited
286 Waterloo Road
Psconsulting Limited
115 Marine Drive