Maxx Honey Limited was incorporated on 31 Aug 1998 and issued an NZ business number of 9429037774417. The registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Bernhard Schneider - an active director whose contract started on 25 Jun 1999,
Martina Schneider-Leisser - an active director whose contract started on 11 Oct 2011,
Bernhard Schneider - an inactive director whose contract started on 31 Aug 1998 and was terminated on 28 Sep 2006,
John Russell Duncan - an inactive director whose contract started on 31 Aug 1998 and was terminated on 28 Sep 2006.
According to our database (last updated on 27 Jul 2024), this company registered 3 addresses: 24 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 (office address),
306 Pomona Road, Ruby Bay, Mapua, 7173 (registered address),
306 Pomona Road, Ruby Bay, Mapua, 7173 (physical address),
306 Pomona Road, Ruby Bay, Mapua, 7173 (service address) among others.
Until 31 Mar 2017, Maxx Honey Limited had been using 24 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua as their registered address.
BizDb identified former names used by this company: from 31 Aug 1998 to 28 Feb 2007 they were called Duncan Schneider International Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Schneider-Leisser, Martina (an individual) located at Upper Moutere postcode 7173.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Schneider, Bernhard - located at Upper Moutere. Maxx Honey Limited is categorised as "Beekeeping" (ANZSIC A019320).
Principal place of activity
24 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 24 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Jun 2012 to 31 Mar 2017
Address #2: 24 Jessie Street, Mapua, Mapua, 7005 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Jun 2012 to 24 Mar 2017
Address #3: 169 Cleveland Terrace, Maitai, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Oct 2011 to 20 Jun 2012
Address #4: Whk Nelson, A Division Of Whk (nz) Ltd, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Jul 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
Address #5: Whk West Yates, A Division Of Whk (nz) Ltd, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2010
Address #6: Whk West Yates, A Division Of Whk (nz) Ltd, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson 7010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Apr 2008 to 29 Jul 2010
Address #7: Richards Woodhouse, 9 Buxton Square, Nelson
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 02 Jul 2008
Address #8: Richards Woodhouse, 9 Buxton Square, Nelson
Physical address used from 03 Dec 1998 to 23 Apr 2008
Address #9: West Yates, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson
Physical address used from 03 Dec 1998 to 03 Dec 1998
Address #10: Richards Woodhouse, 9 Buxton Square, Nelson
Registered address used from 30 Nov 1998 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 10 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Schneider-leisser, Martina |
Upper Moutere 7173 New Zealand |
31 Aug 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Schneider, Bernhard |
Upper Moutere 7173 New Zealand |
31 Aug 1998 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Duncan, Carol Ann |
Nelson |
31 Aug 1998 - 27 Jun 2006 |
Individual | Duncan, John Russell |
Nelson |
31 Aug 1998 - 27 Jun 2006 |
Bernhard Schneider - Director
Appointment date: 25 Jun 1999
Address: Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2017
Martina Schneider-leisser - Director
Appointment date: 11 Oct 2011
Address: Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2017
Bernhard Schneider - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 1998
Termination date: 28 Sep 2006
Address: Nelson,
Address used since 15 Jul 2003
John Russell Duncan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 1998
Termination date: 28 Sep 2006
Address: Nelson,
Address used since 27 Jun 2006
Maxx Marketing Consultants Limited
306 Pomona Road
Real Manuka Limited
306 Pomona Road
Tech Law New Zealand Limited
308 Pomona Road
Southern Mustang & Ford Limited
41 Pine Hill Road
Delafield Services Limited
158 Pomona Road
Vita Life Nz Limited
306 Pomona Road
Honeyhills Limited
141 Holdaway Road
Kahurangi Queen Bees Limited
25 Lacebark Lane
Long River Farm Limited
105 Clover Road
Native New Zealand Honey Limited
44 Oxford Street
Sunnyhills Honey Limited
234 The Coastal Highway
The Sunday Hive Company Limited
222 High Street