Omega Corporation Limited, a registered company, was launched on 20 Nov 1998. 9429037709969 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Marvin Yee - an active director whose contract started on 20 Nov 1998,
Marvin Yen Tuck Yee - an active director whose contract started on 20 Nov 1998.
Updated on 05 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 5, 5A/17 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service).
Omega Corporation Limited had been using 18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland as their physical address up until 23 May 2007.
Previous aliases used by the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 20 Nov 1998 to 17 Apr 2018 they were named Cybercom Technologies Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Yee, Marvin Yen Tuck - located at 1010, Chatswood, Auckland.
Other active addresses
Address #4: C/o Level 5, 5a/17 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 03 Apr 2024
Address #5: Po Box 2638, Shortland Street, Auckland, 1140 New Zealand
Postal address used from 03 Apr 2024
Address #6: Level 5, 5a/17 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 11 Apr 2024
Principal place of activity
18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland
Physical address used from 16 May 2005 to 23 May 2007
Address #2: C/-david B.cox, Accountant, 18 Amante Cres, Mairangi Bay,auckland
Registered address used from 16 May 2005 to 23 May 2007
Address #3: 18 Amante Cresent, Mairangi Bay
Registered address used from 30 Jun 2004 to 16 May 2005
Address #4: 18 Amante Cresent, Maraingi Bay
Physical address used from 30 Jun 2004 to 16 May 2005
Address #5: 50 Salamanca Road, Sunnynook, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 23 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Address #6: 18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Jul 2001 to 23 May 2003
Address #7: 1/39 Bellevue Avenue, Northcote, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Jul 2001 to 10 Jul 2001
Address #8: 18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Jul 2001 to 10 Jul 2001
Address #9: 1/39 Bellevue Avenue, Northcote, Auckland
Registered address used from 10 Jul 2001 to 23 Jul 2001
Address #10: 1 - 39 Bellevue Ave, Northcote, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Jul 2001 to 23 May 2003
Address #11: 1/39 Bellevue Avenue, Northcote, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 10 Jul 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 02 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Yee, Marvin Yen Tuck |
Chatswood Auckland 0626 New Zealand |
10 Apr 2018 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Yee, Marvin |
Totara Vale Auckland 0627 New Zealand |
20 Nov 1998 - 10 Apr 2018 |
Marvin Yee - Director
Appointment date: 20 Nov 1998
Address: Totara Vale, North Shore City, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 26 May 2010
Marvin Yen Tuck Yee - Director
Appointment date: 20 Nov 1998
Address: Chatswood, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Feb 2019
Address: Totara Vale, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Apr 2018
Crown Financial Services Nominees Limited
18 Amante Crescent
Cybercom Hospitality Solutions Limited
18 Amante Crescent
Platinum Electrical Limited
22 Amante Crescent
Ko Olina Investments Limited
22 Amante Crescent
Sch 2015 Limited
3 Theodora Place
The North Shore Youth Orchestra Trust
26 Amante Crescent