Fletcher Building Products Limited was registered on 13 Apr 1999 and issued a business number of 9429037626969. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 24 directors: Bevan John Mckenzie - an active director whose contract began on 11 Nov 2016,
Hamish Todd Mcbeath - an active director whose contract began on 14 Jun 2019,
Francis Charles Wingfield Bolt - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2015 and was terminated on 27 Sep 2019,
Michele Margaret Kernahan - an inactive director whose contract began on 31 Oct 2018 and was terminated on 14 Jun 2019,
David Thomas - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Feb 2018 and was terminated on 31 Oct 2018.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 14 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 810 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 03 Jul 2012, Fletcher Building Products Limited had been using 810 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified former names for the company: from 13 Apr 1999 to 15 Aug 2000 they were named Zurich Holdings (No. 36) Limited.
A total of 120001000 shares are allotted to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 120001000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Fletcher Building Holdings New Zealand Limited (an entity) located at Penrose, Auckland postcode 1061.
Previous addresses
Address: 810 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 May 2001 to 03 Jul 2012
Address: Level 3, 583 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 23 May 2001 to 23 May 2001
Address: 810 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 27 Mar 2001 to 23 May 2001
Address: 810 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 27 Mar 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120001000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 13 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 120001000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Fletcher Building Holdings New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030619012 |
Penrose Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
03 Jul 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Null - Fletcher Building Holdings Limited | 13 Apr 1999 - 03 Jul 2012 | |
Other | Fletcher Building Holdings Limited | 13 Apr 1999 - 03 Jul 2012 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Bevan John Mckenzie - Director
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2016
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2023
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 29 May 2020
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Nov 2016
Hamish Todd Mcbeath - Director
Appointment date: 14 Jun 2019
Address: Rd 1, Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jun 2019
Francis Charles Wingfield Bolt - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2015
Termination date: 27 Sep 2019
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2015
Michele Margaret Kernahan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2018
Termination date: 14 Jun 2019
Address: Orewa, Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2018
David Thomas - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Feb 2018
Termination date: 31 Oct 2018
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2018
Matthew Victor Crockett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Feb 2016
Termination date: 16 Feb 2018
Address: Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Jun 2016
Robert Gerard Bollman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2014
Termination date: 11 Nov 2016
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2014
Francisco Valentin Irazusta Rodriguez - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2015
Termination date: 17 Feb 2016
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jun 2015
Francis Charles Wingfield Bolt - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Oct 2014
Termination date: 30 Jun 2015
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2014
Timothy Charles Richards - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jan 2012
Termination date: 31 Oct 2014
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2013
Nicholas John Olson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Apr 2013
Termination date: 31 Oct 2014
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2013
Willem Jan Roest - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Aug 2000
Termination date: 08 Apr 2013
Address: Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2010
Christopher David Ellis - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Oct 2006
Termination date: 17 Aug 2011
Address: Waterview, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Oct 2006
Andrew Martin Richard Reding - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 May 2001
Termination date: 25 Oct 2006
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Sep 2003
Mark James Binns - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Aug 2000
Termination date: 19 Mar 2004
Address: Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 03 Aug 2000
Martin Clive Farrell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 May 2001
Termination date: 19 Mar 2004
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 07 May 2001
Alexander Toldte - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2000
Termination date: 24 Jan 2001
Address: St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Dec 2000
Terrence Noel Mcfadden - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Sep 2000
Termination date: 01 Dec 2000
Address: One Tree Hill, Auckland,
Address used since 08 Sep 2000
Grant David Niccol - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Apr 1999
Termination date: 03 Aug 2000
Address: St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 13 Apr 1999
John Mcdonald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Apr 1999
Termination date: 03 Aug 2000
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 13 Apr 1999
Mark Alan Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Apr 1999
Termination date: 03 Aug 2000
Address: Torbay, Auckland,
Address used since 13 Apr 1999
Martin Clive Farrell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Dec 1999
Termination date: 03 Aug 2000
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Dec 1999
Mervyn Shane Warbrick - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Apr 1999
Termination date: 24 Mar 2000
Address: St Heliers Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 13 Apr 1999
Gary Clifton Key - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Apr 1999
Termination date: 31 Dec 1999
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 13 Apr 1999
Building Prefabrication Solutions Limited
810 Great South Road
Pavement Technology Limited
810 Great South Road
The Fletcher Construction Company (fanshawe Street) Limited
810 Great South Road
Paul Robinson Building Supplies Limited
810 Great South Road
Selwyn Quarries Limited
810 Great South Road
Penrose Retirement Nominees Limited
810 Great South Road