Boyer Estate Limited, a registered company, was started on 26 May 1999. 9429037590383 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Stockbroking or trading" (business classification K641130) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Lawrence John Boyer - an active director whose contract began on 26 May 1999,
Kathleen May Boyer - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jun 2002.
Last updated on 06 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company registered, namely: 10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 (physical address),
10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 (service address),
10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 (registered address),
P. O. Box 54-011,, The Marina, Auckland, 2144 (postal address) among others.
Boyer Estate Limited had been using 10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach as their registered address up until 11 Jun 2021.
Principal place of activity
10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Apr 2000 to 11 Jun 2021
Address #2: 10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 13 Apr 2000
Address #3: 10 Hattaway Avenue, Bucklands Beach New Zealand
Physical address used from 27 May 1999 to 11 Jun 2021
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 05 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Boyer, Lawrence John |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Lawrence John |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Lawrence John |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Kathleen May |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Dale, Michael John |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Dale, Michael John |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Dale, Michael John |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Lawrence John |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Lawrence John |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Kathleen May |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Kathleen May |
Bucklands Beach |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Individual | Boyer, Kathleen May |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
26 May 1999 - 02 Jun 2021 |
Lawrence John Boyer - Director
Appointment date: 26 May 1999
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 26 May 1999
Kathleen May Boyer - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2002
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2002
Formula Enterprises Limited
10 B Hattaway Ave
Spraywell Industries Limited
3 Morrow Avenue
A Bird Production Management Limited
Flat 3, 5 Morrow Avenue
Flower & Gift Cellar Limited
2/13 Hattaway Avenue
Penagin Contracting Limited
2a Hattaway Avenue
Kexiao Consultancy Limited
15a Hattaway Avenue
Cris Developments Limited
10b Rarangi Rd
Faith Master Trading Limited
35 Prince Regent Drive
Jeet Kune Do Nz Limited
83 Leybourne Circle
Masoomeen Enterprises New Zealand Limited
124 Gills Road
Natural International Limited
10 Malloy Place
O'sully Limited
10 Birman Close