Fiorano Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 31 May 1999. 9429037567781 is the business number it was issued. The company has been run by 3 directors: Bruce Gregory Speers - an active director whose contract began on 31 May 1999,
Kirstin Bell Speers - an active director whose contract began on 01 Apr 2008,
Louise Tracey Wilkinson - an inactive director whose contract began on 31 May 1999 and was terminated on 08 Jun 2006.
Updated on 23 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company registered, namely: 29 Kaimata Road, Napier, 4182 (registered address),
Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 (service address),
Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 (physical address).
Fiorano Limited had been using Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings as their registered address up until 17 Oct 2023.
Previous aliases used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 29 Apr 2008 to 24 Jul 2018 they were called Kbbs Consultancy Limited, from 31 May 1999 to 29 Apr 2008 they were called Fab Investments Limited.
A total of 2000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 1990 shares (99.5%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 10 shares (0.5%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 24 Oct 2019 to 17 Oct 2023
Address #2: Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Jun 2016 to 24 Oct 2019
Address #3: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Physical address used from 04 Oct 2013 to 07 Jun 2016
Address #4: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Oct 2013 to 07 Jun 2016
Address #5: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Nov 2010 to 04 Oct 2013
Address #6: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Nov 2010 to 01 Oct 2013
Address #7: Markhams Hawkes Bay, 405n King Street, Hastings New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Nov 2008 to 01 Nov 2010
Address #8: Markhams Mri Hawkes Bay, 405n King Street, Hastings
Registered & physical address used from 06 Nov 2006 to 04 Nov 2008
Address #9: Markhams Mri Hawkes Bay Ltd, 405n King Street, Hastings
Registered & physical address used from 04 Nov 2004 to 06 Nov 2006
Address #10: 115n King Street, Hastings
Physical address used from 30 Oct 2000 to 30 Oct 2000
Address #11: 405n King Street, Hastings
Physical address used from 30 Oct 2000 to 04 Nov 2004
Address #12: 115n King Street, Hastings
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 04 Nov 2004
Address #13: 115n King Street, Hastings
Registered address used from 20 Sep 1999 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 22 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1990 | |||
Individual | Speers, Kirstin Bell |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Speers, Bruce Gregory |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wilkinson, Louise Tracey |
Havelock North |
31 May 1999 - 26 Oct 2005 |
Individual | Speers, Bruce Gregory |
Napier |
31 May 1999 - 26 Oct 2007 |
Bruce Gregory Speers - Director
Appointment date: 31 May 1999
Address: Rd 2, Napier, 4182 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jan 2015
Kirstin Bell Speers - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2008
Address: Rd 2, Napier, 4182 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jan 2015
Louise Tracey Wilkinson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 May 1999
Termination date: 08 Jun 2006
Address: Havelock North,
Address used since 31 May 1999
Antara Group Limited
Business Hq
Centric Group Limited
Business Hq
Hbs Capital Limited
Unit 3, Business Hq
Doll House Properties Limited
Business H Q
The Clifton Reserve Society Incorporated
Moore Stephens Markhams Hawkes Bay Ltd
Anacott Farms Limited Partnership
Moore Stephens Markhams