Skyways Limited was started on 27 Jul 1999 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037521936. The removed LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Norman Wayne Coley - an active director whose contract started on 27 Jul 1999,
Anne Muriel Coley - an active director whose contract started on 27 Jul 1999.
As stated in our data (last updated on 29 Mar 2024), this company uses 1 address: 13 Callender Place, Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 (category: physical, service).
Up until 06 Sep 2021, Skyways Limited had been using 22 Picton Street, Howick as their physical address.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 5000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Coley, Norman Wayne (an individual) located at Howick.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 5000 shares) and includes
Coley, Anne Muriel - located at Howick.
Previous addresses
Address: 22 Picton Street, Howick New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Dec 2006 to 06 Sep 2021
Address: Shop 6, Rosscourt, 43 Cook Street, Howick
Registered & physical address used from 17 Jun 2005 to 13 Dec 2006
Address: Level 3, Cst Nexia Centre, 22 Amersham Way, Manukau City
Physical & registered address used from 03 Dec 2003 to 17 Jun 2005
Address: C S T Management Centre, Level 3, 22 Amersham Way, Manukau City
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 03 Dec 2003
Address: C S T Management Centre, Level 3, 22 Amersham Way, Manukau City
Physical address used from 27 Jul 1999 to 03 Dec 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 27 Nov 2019
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Coley, Norman Wayne |
Howick New Zealand |
27 Jul 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Coley, Anne Muriel |
Howick New Zealand |
27 Jul 1999 - |
Norman Wayne Coley - Director
Appointment date: 27 Jul 1999
Address: Shelly Park, Manukau, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2009
Anne Muriel Coley - Director
Appointment date: 27 Jul 1999
Address: Shelly Park, Manukau, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Dec 2009
Ultimate Building Solutions Limited
Flat 2, 22 Picton Street
Toppik Nz Limited
Flat 1, 22 Picton Street
Triple A & Y Limited
22 Picton Street
Tiki Quarry Farms Limited
22 Picton Street
Formtool Engineering Services Limited
Flat 1, 22 Picton Street
Rockfield Woodworkers (2003) Limited
22 Picton Street