Bay Performance Management Limited was started on 04 Feb 2000 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037373665. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Robert Alexander Egan - an active director whose contract started on 04 Feb 2000,
Michael John Dorset - an active director whose contract started on 25 May 2000.
According to our data (updated on 03 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 37 Monmouth Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (types include: physical, registered).
Up until 28 Sep 2020, Bay Performance Management Limited had been using 30 Cameron Road, Tauranga as their physical address.
BizDb found former names for the company: from 10 Apr 2000 to 02 Dec 2009 they were called Bay Sports Management Limited, from 04 Feb 2000 to 10 Apr 2000 they were called Rae Nominees Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Dorset, Michael John (an individual) located at Brookfield, Tauranga postcode 3110.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Egan, Robert Alexander - located at Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach.
Previous addresses
Address: 30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Nov 2017 to 28 Sep 2020
Address: 30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jan 2009 to 09 Nov 2017
Address: 97 Edgecumbe Road, Tauranga
Registered & physical address used from 09 May 2002 to 22 Jan 2009
Address: Ladkin Graham & Co, Chartered Accountant, 36 Cameron Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 09 May 2002
Address: Ladkin Graham & Co, Chartered Accountant, 36 Cameron Road, Tauranga
Physical address used from 04 Feb 2000 to 09 May 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 23 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Dorset, Michael John |
Brookfield Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
04 Feb 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Egan, Robert Alexander |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 New Zealand |
04 Feb 2000 - |
Robert Alexander Egan - Director
Appointment date: 04 Feb 2000
Address: Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Apr 2021
Address: Rd 7, Tauranga, 3179 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2012
Michael John Dorset - Director
Appointment date: 25 May 2000
Address: Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Sep 2020
Address: Ohinemutu, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2011
Fisk Concrete Contracting 2011 Limited
30 Cameron Road
Camel Properties Limited
30 Cameron Road
Bm Autobahn Limited
30 Cameron Road
Day Property Limited
30 Cameron Road
Lloyd James Construction Limited
30 Cameron Road
Direct Spa Pools Limited
30 Cameron Road