Bvi Investments Limited, a registered company, was started on 17 Mar 2000. 9429037357382 is the business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Alexander Henry Clark - an active director whose contract began on 17 Mar 2000,
Rex Evan Thomas - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 Mar 2000 and was terminated on 18 Feb 2011.
Updated on 01 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: 296 Queen Street, Masterton, 5810 (category: registered, physical).
Bvi Investments Limited had been using 296 Queen Street, Masterton as their physical address until 30 Mar 2022.
Former names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 17 Mar 2000 to 19 Dec 2011 they were named Pakohe Partnership Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Bellevue Developments Limited - located at 5810, Masterton.
Previous addresses
Address: 296 Queen Street, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 May 2013 to 30 Mar 2022
Address: Morgan & Co Chartered Accountants Limite, 296 Queen Street, Masterton New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Apr 2000 to 20 May 2013
Address: Morgan & Co Chartered Accountants Limite, 296 Queen Street, Masterton
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 13 Apr 2000
Address: Morgan & Co Chartered Accountants Limite, 296 Queen Street, Masterton New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Mar 2000 to 20 May 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 26 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bellevue Developments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037376574 |
Masterton 5810 New Zealand |
17 Mar 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Thomas, Rex Evan |
Rd 1 Martinborough |
17 Mar 2000 - 21 Feb 2011 |
Alexander Henry Clark - Director
Appointment date: 17 Mar 2000
Address: Rd 11, Masterton, 5871 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2015
Rex Evan Thomas - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Mar 2000
Termination date: 18 Feb 2011
Address: Rd 1, Martinborough,
Address used since 17 Mar 2000
Braders Car Court (2013) Limited
296 Queen Street
The Hive Chartered Accountants Limited
296 Queen Street
Ennals Consulting Limited
296 Queen Street
Kereru Advance Group Limited
296 Queen Street
Wilkinson Construction Limited
296 Queen Street
David Pope Limited
296 Queen Street