Montreux Trust Limited, a registered company, was launched on 21 Feb 2000. 9429037355388 is the number it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Stewart Francis Mahon - an active director whose contract began on 21 Feb 2000,
Neville Christopher Mahon - an active director whose contract began on 21 Feb 2000.
Updated on 16 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 3, 11-15 Great South Road, Newmarket, Auckland (category: physical, registered).
Montreux Trust Limited had been using 393 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, New Zealand as their registered address up until 15 Apr 2004.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 49 shares (49%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 51 shares (51%).
Previous addresses
Address: 393 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 May 2002 to 15 Apr 2004
Address: 393 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland
Registered address used from 22 Apr 2002 to 10 May 2002
Address: 393 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland
Physical address used from 22 Apr 2002 to 15 Apr 2004
Address: Level 15, Asb Bank Centre, 135 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 06 Apr 2001 to 22 Apr 2002
Address: Level 4, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland
Physical address used from 06 Apr 2001 to 06 Apr 2001
Address: Level 4, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland
Registered address used from 28 Mar 2001 to 06 Apr 2001
Address: Level 4, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 28 Mar 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 28 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | Mahon, Stewart Francis |
Queenstown New Zealand |
21 Feb 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 51 | |||
Individual | Mahon, Neville Christopher |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
21 Feb 2000 - |
Stewart Francis Mahon - Director
Appointment date: 21 Feb 2000
Address: Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2010
Neville Christopher Mahon - Director
Appointment date: 21 Feb 2000
Address: Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2010
Shellbark Trust Limited
Level 3
Winton Investments Limited
Level 3
Rochester Group Limited
Level 3
Southern Restaurants Limited
Level 3
Fairburn Trust Limited
Level 3
Geneva Investments Limited
Level 3