Frank & Co Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 13 Mar 2000. 9429037353544 is the NZ business number it was issued. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Betty Geok-Eng Tan - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 2000,
Keow Song Lim - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 2000,
Frank Keow Song Lim - an active director whose contract started on 13 Mar 2000.
Last updated on 25 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 454 St Asaph Street, Phillipstown, Christchurch, 8011 (type: registered, physical).
Frank & Co Limited had been using 7 Sheraton Place, Redwood, Christchurch as their registered address until 29 Aug 2017.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 5000 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 5000 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 7 Sheraton Place, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Jul 2016 to 29 Aug 2017
Address: 30 Glandovey Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Nov 2011 to 04 Jul 2016
Address: 18 Stewart St, Off Moorhouse Ave, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Jul 2007 to 17 Nov 2011
Address: 18 Stewart Street, Off Moorhouse Ave, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Jul 2007 to 17 Nov 2011
Address: 272 Tuam Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 26 Nov 2004 to 09 Jul 2007
Address: 309 Main South Road, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 26 Nov 2004
Address: 309 Main South Road, Christchurch
Physical address used from 14 Mar 2000 to 26 Nov 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 09 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Director | Lim, Keow Song |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
19 May 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Tan, Betty Geok-eng |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
13 Mar 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Lim, Frank Keow Song |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
13 Mar 2000 - 19 May 2023 |
Betty Geok-eng Tan - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 2000
Address: Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jun 2019
Address: Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2016
Keow Song Lim - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 2000
Address: Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jun 2019
Frank Keow Song Lim - Director
Appointment date: 13 Mar 2000
Address: Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jun 2019
Address: Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2016
Euro Motors Limited
454 St Asaph Street
Sls Holdings (2008) Limited
469 St Asaph Street
Tandem Smash Repairs (1996) Limited
469 St Asaph St
Te Hohepa Te Kohanga Reo Whanau Trust Incorporated
34 Phillips Street
One On One Driver Training (2007) Limited
442 Tuam Street
Members, Church Of God International (south Island, New Zeal
442 Tuam Street