Bai.nz Limited was registered on 24 Feb 2000 and issued an NZ business number of 9429037349813. The registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Anne Catherine Menzies - an active director whose contract began on 15 Apr 2013,
Keith James Bainbridge - an inactive director whose contract began on 29 Nov 2012 and was terminated on 15 Apr 2013,
Anne Catherine Menzies - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Mar 2005 and was terminated on 29 Nov 2012,
Keith James Bainbridge - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Feb 2000 and was terminated on 01 Mar 2005.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 53 Anzac Valley Road, Waitakere, Auckland, 0816 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 05 Dec 2017, Bai.nz Limited had been using 83 Waitakere Road, Waitakere, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified past names for the company: from 24 Feb 2000 to 06 Jul 2005 they were called Bainbridge Development & Construction Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 450 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Bainbridge, Keith (an individual) located at Waitakere, Auckland postcode 0816.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 45% shares (exactly 450 shares) and includes
Menzies, Anne Catherine - located at Waitakere, Auckland.
The next share allocation (100 shares, 10%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Menzies, Anne Catherine, located at Waitakere, Auckland (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: 83 Waitakere Road, Waitakere, Auckland, 0816 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Jun 2017 to 05 Dec 2017
Address: 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jul 2009 to 07 Jun 2017
Address: C/-hargrave Accounting Limited, 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 09 Jun 2006 to 10 Jul 2009
Address: Ground Floor, 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland
Physical address used from 13 May 2005 to 09 Jun 2006
Address: C/-hargrave Accounting Limited, Ground Floor, 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckalnd
Registered address used from 13 May 2005 to 09 Jun 2006
Address: Level 1, 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 13 May 2005
Address: Level 1, 3 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland
Physical address used from 24 Feb 2000 to 13 May 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 02 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 450 | |||
Individual | Bainbridge, Keith |
Waitakere Auckland 0816 New Zealand |
16 May 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 450 | |||
Individual | Menzies, Anne Catherine |
Waitakere Auckland 0816 New Zealand |
25 Jul 2019 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Menzies, Anne Catherine |
Waitakere Auckland 0816 New Zealand |
25 Jul 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bainbridge, Keith James |
Mt Albert Auckland |
05 May 2004 - 06 May 2005 |
Individual | Bainbridge, Keith James |
Mt Albert Auckland |
05 May 2004 - 06 May 2005 |
Entity | Dwl Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030410084 Company Number: 4162678 |
Henderson Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2013 - 16 May 2022 |
Entity | Dwl Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030410084 Company Number: 4162678 |
Henderson Auckland 0610 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2013 - 16 May 2022 |
Entity | Dwl Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030410084 Company Number: 4162678 |
Henderson Auckland 0612 New Zealand |
08 Feb 2013 - 16 May 2022 |
Individual | Anne Catherine, Menzies |
Waitakere Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
05 May 2004 - 25 Jul 2019 |
Individual | Anne Catherine, Menzies |
Waitakere Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
05 May 2004 - 25 Jul 2019 |
Individual | Menzies, Anne Catherine |
Mount Albert |
22 Jun 2005 - 22 Jun 2005 |
Individual | Anne Catherine, Menzies |
Waitakere Auckland 0614 New Zealand |
05 May 2004 - 25 Jul 2019 |
Individual | Palmer, Simon |
Mt Albert Auckland New Zealand |
05 May 2004 - 08 Feb 2013 |
Anne Catherine Menzies - Director
Appointment date: 15 Apr 2013
Address: Waitakere, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2013
Keith James Bainbridge - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2012
Termination date: 15 Apr 2013
Address: Waitakere, Auckland, 0614 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jan 2013
Anne Catherine Menzies - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Mar 2005
Termination date: 29 Nov 2012
Address: Mount Albert, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Mar 2005
Keith James Bainbridge - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Feb 2000
Termination date: 01 Mar 2005
Address: Mt Albert, Auckland,
Address used since 05 May 2004
Tew & Smyth Investments Limited
67 Anzac Valley Road
Black Falcon Limited
137 Anzac Valley Road
Sixty-six Auckland Limited
131 Anzac Valley Road
D & D Cooper Limited
173 Anzac Valley Road
Lounge Bar Limited
48 Anzac Valley Road
Green Bay Auto Services Limited
179 Anzac Valley Road