Mucho Gusto Wine Co Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 25 Feb 2000. 9429037348984 is the business number it was issued. "Beer, wine and spirit wholesaling" (ANZSIC F360610) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Stephen Bennett - an active director whose contract began on 25 Feb 2000,
Mathew Deller - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Feb 2000 and was terminated on 30 Jun 2011.
Updated on 04 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company registered, namely: 9 Landscape Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (office address),
9 Landscape Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (delivery address),
9 Landscape Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (registered address),
9 Landscape Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (physical address) among others.
Mucho Gusto Wine Co Limited had been using 56 Sarsfield Street, Herne Bay, Auckland as their registered address until 09 Oct 2019.
Previous aliases used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 25 May 2005 to 21 Mar 2019 they were named Bennett & Deller Wine Limited, from 25 Feb 2000 to 25 May 2005 they were named Bennett & Deller Wine Merchants Limited.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Bennett, Stephen - located at 1024, Mt Eden, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
9 Landscape Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 56 Sarsfield Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 Sep 2019 to 09 Oct 2019
Address #2: 69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Nov 2008 to 24 Sep 2019
Address #3: C/-the Offices Of Kendons Chartered, Accountants Ltd, 69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt
Registered & physical address used from 16 Dec 2004 to 07 Nov 2008
Address #4: Buchanan & Associates, 441 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 16 Dec 2004
Address #5: Buchanan & Associates, 441 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland
Physical address used from 25 Feb 2000 to 16 Dec 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 06 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Bennett, Stephen |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
25 Feb 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Deller, Mathew |
Oraki Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
25 Feb 2000 - 06 Oct 2011 |
Stephen Bennett - Director
Appointment date: 25 Feb 2000
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2019
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Oct 2008
Mathew Deller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Feb 2000
Termination date: 30 Jun 2011
Address: Orakei, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Nov 2009
W M Bamford & Co Limited
69 Rutherford Street
Dovella Homes Limited
69 Rutherford Street
Teachertalk Limited
69 Rutherford Street
Carterton Medical Centre (2013) Limited
69 Rutherford Street
Evergreens Group Limited
69 Rutherford Street
Gaffney Jones Trustees Limited
69 Rutherford Street
Artigiano Imports Limited
623 Marine Drive
Fullcircle International Trade Limited
193 Main Road
Global Wine And Beverage Company Limited
116 Nicholson Road
Southern Pacific Wine Company (nz) Limited
63 Major Drive
Spirit Animal Limited
18 Toporoa View
Whitehaven Distribution Limited
63 Major Drive