The Forest Rangers 2005 Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 11 Apr 2000. 9429037287214 is the NZBN it was issued. "Pest control service nec" (ANZSIC N731210) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Murray Keith Leckie - an active director whose contract started on 11 Apr 2000,
David Kieth Leckie - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jun 2012,
David Keith Leckie - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Apr 2000 and was terminated on 30 Jul 2008.
Updated on 07 Jun 2020, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 9 Acland St, Kokatahi, Hokitika, 7881, 7881 (category: physical, registered).
The Forest Rangers 2005 Limited had been using 5 Acland St, Kokatahi, Rd 1, Hokitika 7881 as their physical address until 10 Aug 2010.
Previous aliases used by this company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 11 Apr 2000 to 13 Dec 2004 they were called Westland Hunters Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Principal place of activity
9 Acland St, Kokatahi, Hokitika, 7881 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 5 Acland St, Kokatahi, Rd 1, Hokitika 7881 New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Apr 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
Address: 5 Acland St, Kokatahi, Hokitika, 7881 New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Apr 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
Address: 67 Taylor St, Taylorville, Greymouth 7805
Physical & registered address used from 06 Aug 2008 to 17 Apr 2009
Address: 9 Oxford St, Taylorville, Greymouth
Registered & physical address used from 27 Sep 2007 to 06 Aug 2008
Address: 528 Norman Rd, Forest Hill Rd 1, Winton, 9662
Registered & physical address used from 24 Mar 2006 to 27 Sep 2007
Address: 1781 Dipton Winton Highway, Winton Rd 29662
Registered address used from 02 Nov 2004 to 24 Mar 2006
Address: 1781 Dipton Winton Highway, Winton Rd 2, 9662
Physical address used from 02 Nov 2004 to 24 Mar 2006
Address: 25 Prince St, Winton, 9662
Physical & registered address used from 09 Aug 2002 to 02 Nov 2004
Address: 25 Prince Street, Winton 9662
Registered address used from 08 Aug 2002 to 09 Aug 2002
Address: Station Road, R.d. 1, Kowhitirangi, Hokitika
Registered address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 08 Aug 2002
Address: 25 Prince Street, Winton 9662
Physical address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
Address: Station Road, R.d. 1, Kowhitirangi, Hokitika
Physical address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 09 Aug 2002
Address: 118 Mackenzie St, Winton, Invercargill 9662
Physical address used from 30 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 17 Jul 2019
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Murray Keith Leckie |
Kokatahi Rd 1 Hokitika 7881 New Zealand |
11 Apr 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | David Kieth Leckie |
Rd 1 Hokitika 7881 New Zealand |
05 Aug 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | David Keith Leckie |
Winton Invercargill 9662 |
11 Apr 2000 - 30 Jul 2008 |
Murray Keith Leckie - Director
Appointment date: 11 Apr 2000
Address: Rd 1, Hokitika, 7881 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2015
David Kieth Leckie - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2012
Address: Rd 1, Hokitika, 7881 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 2016
David Keith Leckie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Apr 2000
Termination date: 30 Jul 2008
Address: Forest Hill Rd 1, Winton, 9662,
Address used since 18 Mar 2006
Kokatahi Block Limited
11 Mantell Street
Aka Ventures Limited
111 Winslow Willowby Road
Alcan Limited
10 Pamela Terrace
Mike The Spider Man Limited
156 Ashworths Road
Ruby Hunter Limited
128 South Belt
Spiderban Limited
166 Harrison Street
Wild Boar Enterprises Limited
369 High Street