Mercy Medical Services Limited, a registered company, was registered on 20 Jun 2000. 9429037255053 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Investment - financial assets" (business classification K624040) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Nicole Maya Anderson - an active director whose contract began on 20 Jun 2000,
Ross Malcolm Anderson - an active director whose contract began on 14 Mar 2024,
Samuel John Anderson - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Feb 2016 and was terminated on 14 Mar 2024,
Ross Malcolm Anderson - an inactive director whose contract began on 20 Jun 2000 and was terminated on 29 Sep 2008.
Last updated on 09 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 5 addresses the company uses, namely: 26A Diamond Avenue, Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 (registered address),
26A Diamond Avenue, Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 (service address),
31 Sugden Street, Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 (registered address),
31 Sugden Street, Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 (service address) among others.
Mercy Medical Services Limited had been using 158 Matsons Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch as their registered address up to 16 Dec 2021.
Other names for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 15 Nov 2000 to 30 Sep 2008 they were called Anderson Health Online Limited, from 20 Jun 2000 to 15 Nov 2000 they were called Healthnow Limited.
A total of 100000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50000 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50000 shares (50%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 31 Sugden Street, Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 06 Dec 2022
Address #5: 26a Diamond Avenue, Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 22 Mar 2024
Principal place of activity
538 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 158 Matsons Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Oct 2018 to 16 Dec 2021
Address #2: 538 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Aug 2016 to 03 Oct 2018
Address #3: 71 Orbell Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8140 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Dec 2013 to 04 Aug 2016
Address #4: 158 Matsons Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch 8053 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Dec 2009 to 19 Dec 2013
Address #5: C/-miller Gale & Winter, Level 6 Amuri Courts, 293 Durham Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 07 Oct 2008 to 04 Dec 2009
Address #6: 43 Sugden Street, Spreydon, Christchurch 8002
Registered & physical address used from 20 Jun 2000 to 07 Oct 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 12 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50000 | |||
Individual | Anderson, Nicole Maya |
Spreydon Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50000 | |||
Individual | Anderson, Ross Malcolm |
Spreydon Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2000 - |
Nicole Maya Anderson - Director
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2000
Address: Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Mar 2024
Address: Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Aug 2022
Address: Al-madeenah Street, Al-luqta, Doha, 3050 Qatar
Address used since 10 Nov 2016
Ross Malcolm Anderson - Director
Appointment date: 14 Mar 2024
Address: Spreydon, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Mar 2024
Samuel John Anderson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Feb 2016
Termination date: 14 Mar 2024
Address: Kaiapoi, Kaiapoi, 7630 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Nov 2022
Address: Kaiapoi, 7630 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Nov 2020
Address: Rd 2, Kaiapoi, 7692 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2016
Ross Malcolm Anderson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2000
Termination date: 29 Sep 2008
Address: Spreydon, Christchurch 8002,
Address used since 20 Jun 2000
B S Financial Services Limited
538 Wairakei Road
Garden City Finance Limited
538 Wairakei Road
Garden City Business & Tax Limited
538 Wairakei Road
Kiwiclean Christchurch Limited
538 Wairakei Road
S B Financial Solutions Limited
538 Wairakei Road
Southern Blue Services Limited
538 Wairakei Road
Acm Investments Limited
568 Wairakei Road
Berry Farm Investments Limited
568 Wairakei Road
Kalmar Holdings Limited
Unit 4/567 Wairakei Road
Mcp Holdings Limited
524a Wairakei Road
Rathgen Holdings Limited
32 Sheffield Crescent
Ullrich Holdings Limited
Unit 4/567 Wairakei Road