Precipice Developments Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 30 Jun 2000. 9429037217785 is the number it was issued. The company has been run by 1 director, named Hudson Ralph Biggs - an active director whose contract started on 30 Jun 2000.
Last updated on 08 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 41 Coolock Crescent, Waverley, Dunedin, 9013 (type: physical, registered).
Precipice Developments Limited had been using 41 Coolock Crescent, Waverley, Dunedin as their registered address up to 12 Nov 2010.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 90 shares (90%) held by 2 entities. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 10 shares (10%).
Previous address
Address: 41 Coolock Crescent, Waverley, Dunedin New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Jun 2000 to 12 Nov 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 07 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Individual | Biggs, Hudson Ralph |
Waverley Dunedin 9013 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2005 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Trustee & Custodian Service Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041047385 |
Dunedin 9013 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Biggs, Hudson Ralph |
Waverley Dunedin 9013 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Broad, Alastair Evans |
Dunedin |
30 Jun 2000 - 27 Nov 2014 |
Individual | Biggs, Bryce Norman |
Rangiora Christchurch 7691 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2000 - 02 Nov 2015 |
Hudson Ralph Biggs - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2000
Address: Waverley, Dunedin, 9013 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Jun 2000
Splinter Resources Limited
41 Coolock Crescent
W J Haynes Limited
41 Coolock Crescent
Foundry Enterprises Limited
41 Coolock Crescent
Trustee & Custodian Service Limited
41 Coolock Crescent
Accounting & Finance Limited
41 Coolock Crescent
Trustee & Prudential Limited
41 Coolock Crescent