Taylor Pa Services Limited, a registered company, was started on 10 Aug 2000. 9429037170035 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Business administrative service" (ANZSIC N729110) is how the company was classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Priscilla Mary Taylor - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2001,
Kevin Harold Peterson - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Aug 2000 and was terminated on 14 Aug 2002.
Updated on 04 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company registered, specifically: Flat 12, 6 Sarsfield Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (registered address),
Flat 12, 6 Sarsfield Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (physical address),
Flat 12, 6 Sarsfield Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (service address),
1/21 Wanganui Avenue, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 (other address) among others.
Taylor Pa Services Limited had been using Flat 1, 22 Picton Street, Howick, Auckland as their registered address up to 29 Apr 2020.
Old names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 26 Sep 2012 to 02 Feb 2016 they were called Yoga By Design Limited, from 10 Aug 2000 to 26 Sep 2012 they were called Mcclay Securities Limited.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Taylor, Priscilla Mary - located at 1011, Herne Bay, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Flat 1, 22 Picton Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 May 2017 to 29 Apr 2020
Address #2: 1/21 Wanganui Avenue, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Apr 2014 to 17 May 2017
Address #3: 57o Livingstone Street, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Apr 2014 to 17 May 2017
Address #4: 164 Kohimarama Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Physical address used from 03 May 2013 to 28 Apr 2014
Address #5: 4 Picton Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 03 May 2013 to 28 Apr 2014
Address #6: First Floor, 217 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Nov 2010 to 03 May 2013
Address #7: 7/9 Curran Street, Herne Bay, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Apr 2006 to 25 Nov 2010
Address #8: 13/130 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 10 Aug 2000 to 06 Apr 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Taylor, Priscilla Mary |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Peterson, Kevin Harold |
Greenlane Auckland |
07 May 2004 - 07 May 2004 |
Priscilla Mary Taylor - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2001
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Dec 2019
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2014
Kevin Harold Peterson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Aug 2000
Termination date: 14 Aug 2002
Address: Greenlane, Auckland,
Address used since 10 Aug 2000
Ultimate Building Solutions Limited
Flat 2, 22 Picton Street
Toppik Nz Limited
Flat 1, 22 Picton Street
Triple A & Y Limited
22 Picton Street
Tiki Quarry Farms Limited
22 Picton Street
Formtool Engineering Services Limited
Flat 1, 22 Picton Street
Rockfield Woodworkers (2003) Limited
22 Picton Street
Endymion Holdings Limited
46 Sale Street
Gmt Operations Limited
Flat 1
Outsourced Business Services Limited
46 Uxbridge Road
Quality Office Solutions Limited
167 Cook Street
Shunik Trustee Company Limited
Flat 1, 22 Picton Street
Tlc Office Services Limited
27a Selwyn Road