Hothi Property Investments Limited was incorporated on 20 Sep 2000 and issued a number of 9429037140366. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Gurjit Singh - an active director whose contract started on 20 Sep 2000,
Junita Devi - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Sep 2000 and was terminated on 07 Jan 2010,
Phanom Songkhram - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Sep 2000 and was terminated on 12 Oct 2000.
According to our database (last updated on 31 Jul 2024), this company uses 1 address: an address for records at 24 Russell Robertson Drive, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 (category: other, records).
Up until 23 Jun 2005, Hothi Property Investments Limited had been using 2 Lipscombe Crescent, Havelock North as their registered address.
BizDb identified past names for this company: from 12 Oct 2000 to 26 Jul 2006 they were named Flavour Of India Limited, from 20 Sep 2000 to 12 Oct 2000 they were named Flavour Of Asia Limited.
A total of 50000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 24999 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Devi, Junita (an individual) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 25001 shares) and includes
Singh, Gurjit - located at Havelock North, Havelock North.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 2 Lipscombe Crescent, Havelock North
Registered & physical address used from 18 Jun 2003 to 23 Jun 2005
Address #2: 2 Lipscombe Crescent, Havelock North
Registered address used from 09 Nov 2001 to 18 Jun 2003
Address #3: Kevin Williams & Associates, 303n Karamu Road, Hastings
Physical address used from 20 Sep 2000 to 18 Jun 2003
Address #4: 2 Lipscombe Crescent, Havelock North
Physical address used from 20 Sep 2000 to 20 Sep 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 50000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 05 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 24999 | |||
Individual | Devi, Junita |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 New Zealand |
20 Sep 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 25001 | |||
Individual | Singh, Gurjit |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 New Zealand |
20 Sep 2000 - |
Gurjit Singh - Director
Appointment date: 20 Sep 2000
Address: Havelock North, Hastings, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Nov 2015
Junita Devi - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Sep 2000
Termination date: 07 Jan 2010
Address: Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jun 2005
Phanom Songkhram - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Sep 2000
Termination date: 12 Oct 2000
Address: Havelock North,
Address used since 20 Sep 2000
B And C Adema Limited
30 Russell Robertson Drive
Barnhill House & Marine Improvement Services Limited
1 Redwood Close
Reddish Traffic Engineering Limited
4 Ayrshire Drive
Baker Properties Limited
5 Redwood Close
Baker Electrical Limited
5 Redwood Close
Panther Sports Limited
18 Olive Grove