O'connell Chambers Limited was started on 01 Nov 2000 and issued an NZ business number of 9429037093686. This registered LTD company has been managed by 8 directors: James Lindsay Smylie - an active director whose contract began on 01 Nov 2000,
Eugene St John - an active director whose contract began on 01 Nov 2000,
Mark Wynon Vickerman - an active director whose contract began on 24 May 2001,
Daniel William Grove - an active director whose contract began on 01 Jun 2017,
Lisa Lynn La Mantia - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 May 2017 and was terminated on 08 May 2024.
As stated in our database (updated on 29 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: P O Box 14020, Tauranga, 3110 (type: postal, office).
Up until 08 Oct 2007, O'connell Chambers Limited had been using Level 8, 53 Fort Street, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 1500 shares are allocated to 4 groups (7 shareholders in total). In the first group, 600 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
St John, Eugene (an individual) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024,
Jze Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1023.
The 2nd group consists of 2 shareholders, holds 20% shares (exactly 300 shares) and includes
Bct Ernest Limited - located at 61 High Street, Auckland,
Vickerman, Mark Wynon - located at Freemans Bay, Auckland.
The third share allotment (375 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Smylie, James Lindsay, located at Tauranga (an individual). O'connell Chambers Limited has been categorised as "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250).
Principal place of activity
78 Maxwell Road, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 8, 53 Fort Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 29 Nov 2006 to 08 Oct 2007
Address #2: 5th Floor, 3-13 Shortland Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 30 Nov 2001 to 29 Nov 2006
Address #3: 5th Floor, 3-13 Shortland Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 30 Nov 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Address #4: O'connell Chambers Ltd, Level 5, 3 Shortland St, Auckland
Physical address used from 30 Nov 2001 to 29 Nov 2006
Address #5: Level 6, 70 Shortland Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 02 Oct 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Address #6: Level 6, 70 Shortland Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Nov 2001
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1500
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 02 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 600 | |||
Individual | St John, Eugene |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2000 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Jze Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036133239 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
10 Nov 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bct Ernest Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042344155 |
61 High Street Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
27 Jul 2019 - |
Individual | Vickerman, Mark Wynon |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
01 Nov 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 375 | |||
Individual | Smylie, James Lindsay |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
02 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 225 | |||
Individual | Grove, Nuala Mary |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
08 May 2017 - |
Individual | Grove, Daniel William |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
08 May 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcdonald, Stephen John |
Auckland New Zealand |
02 Oct 2007 - 10 Nov 2014 |
Individual | La Mantia, Lisa Lynn |
Avondale Auckland 1026 New Zealand |
08 May 2017 - 17 May 2024 |
Individual | Johnton, Donald Howard |
Tauranga New Zealand |
02 Oct 2007 - 03 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Smylie, James Lindsay |
Tauranga |
01 Nov 2000 - 09 Nov 2006 |
Individual | Bruton, Vanessa Tautu Matarii |
Belmont Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
08 May 2017 - 11 Dec 2020 |
Individual | Werry, Edward John Loughnan |
Woodhill Auckland |
09 Nov 2006 - 09 Nov 2006 |
Individual | Werry, Edward |
Auckland New Zealand |
02 Oct 2007 - 03 Sep 2012 |
Individual | Werry, Edward John Loughnan |
Woodhill Auckland |
01 Nov 2000 - 12 Apr 2006 |
Individual | Grove, Daniel William |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
08 May 2017 - 08 May 2017 |
Individual | Smyth, David Edward |
Remuera Auckland |
01 Nov 2000 - 13 Oct 2016 |
James Lindsay Smylie - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2000
Address: Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
Eugene St John - Director
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2000
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
Mark Wynon Vickerman - Director
Appointment date: 24 May 2001
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 24 May 2001
Daniel William Grove - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jun 2017
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2017
Lisa Lynn La Mantia - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 May 2017
Termination date: 08 May 2024
Address: Avondale, Auckland, 1026 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2017
Vanessa Matarii Bruton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 May 2017
Termination date: 10 Dec 2020
Address: Belmont, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2017
David Edward Smyth - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2000
Termination date: 10 Nov 2014
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2000
Edward John Loughnan Werry - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Nov 2000
Termination date: 24 Mar 2006
Address: Woodhill, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Nov 2000
Linsa Finance Limited
78 Maxwell Rd
Linsa Limited
78 Maxwell Road
Wbf1 Limited
78 Maxwell Road
Inverlochy Trustee Limited
70 Maxwells Road
Te Weta Bay Limited
51 Myres Street
Sgk Investments Limited
41 Myres Street
Cherrywood Buildings Limited
23 Myres Street
Lawrence Trading Company Limited
163 Pillans Road
Peak Road Farm Co Limited
6 Vale Street
Ra & Cb Holdings Limited
23 Myres Street
Rowan James Limited
23 Myres Street
Wbf1 Limited
78 Maxwell Road