Number 2 Limited, a registered company, was launched on 07 Dec 2000. 9429037059330 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Real estate agency service" (ANZSIC L672010) is how the company is categorised. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Timothy James Wilkins - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2000,
Leah Maree Wilkins - an active director whose contract began on 07 Dec 2000.
Updated on 23 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 204 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 (type: delivery, office).
Number 2 Limited had been using 405N King Street, Hastings as their registered address until 16 Jul 2013.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 98 shares (98 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent). Lastly the 3rd share allocation (1 share 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
204 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Jul 2013 to 16 Jul 2013
Address #2: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Registered address used from 26 Jul 2010 to 02 Jul 2013
Address #3: 405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 New Zealand
Physical address used from 26 Jul 2010 to 16 Jul 2013
Address #4: Markhams Hawkes Bay, 405n King Street, Hastings New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Jul 2008 to 26 Jul 2010
Address #5: Markhams Mri Hawkes Bay, 405n King Street, Hastings
Registered & physical address used from 24 Jul 2006 to 21 Jul 2008
Address #6: Markhams Mri Hawkes Bay Ltd, 405n King Street, Hastings
Registered & physical address used from 27 Jun 2005 to 24 Jul 2006
Address #7: Denton Donovan Limited, 405n King Street, Hastings
Physical & registered address used from 07 Dec 2000 to 27 Jun 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 21 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Bay Cities Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038204074 |
308 Queen Street East Hastings 4122 New Zealand |
14 Jul 2008 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Wilkins, Timothy James |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Wilkins, Leah Maree |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 New Zealand |
07 Dec 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wilkins, Mathew Kevin |
Havelock North |
07 Dec 2000 - 28 Jul 2004 |
Timothy James Wilkins - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2000
Address: Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2014
Leah Maree Wilkins - Director
Appointment date: 07 Dec 2000
Address: Havelock North, 4130 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Jul 2014
Whangaehu Trust Limited
204 Queen Street East
Qe204 Limited
204 Queen Street East
Snow & Wilkins Limited
204 Queen Street East
Taupo Rl Property Limited
206 Queen Street East
Sleeping Giant Trustees Limited
206 Queen Street East
Hastings Commercials (2011) Limited
Gifford Devine
For Farms (havelock North) Limited
35 Havelock Road
Hawkes Bay Residential Limited
Level 1
Professional Practices Limited
1017 Heretaunga Street East
Property Associates Limited
337 Westminster Avenue
Value Auto Traders Limited
308 Princes Street
Ward-wilson Properties Limited
406a Windsor Avenue