Bodyfx New Zealand Limited, a registered company, was registered on 20 Mar 2001. 9429036992102 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Cosmetic retailing" (business classification G427120) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Nicole Heydenrijk - an active director whose contract began on 20 Mar 2001,
Jacomina Jacoba Gezina Schuurman - an active director whose contract began on 20 Mar 2001,
Yolanda Bartram - an active director whose contract began on 26 Mar 2013,
Julian Bartram - an active director whose contract began on 23 May 2018.
Last updated on 16 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 10 Collins Street, Morningside, Auckland, 1025 (types include: registered, physical).
Bodyfx New Zealand Limited had been using 10 Collins Street, Morningside, Morningside, Auckland as their physical address up until 01 Jun 2022.
Previous names used by this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 20 Mar 2001 to 07 Dec 2011 they were called Bodyfx Wellington Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Fx Studios Holdings Limited - located at 1025, Morningside, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: 10 Collins Street, Morningside, Morningside, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 May 2022 to 01 Jun 2022
Address: 607 New North Road, Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Mar 2022 to 26 May 2022
Address: Level 4/117-125 Saint Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Jul 2020 to 21 Mar 2022
Address: 7 Windsor Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Oct 2015 to 17 Jul 2020
Address: 382 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2014 to 07 Oct 2015
Address: 607 New North Road, Kingsland, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Mar 2012 to 12 Sep 2014
Address: 320 Moores Valley Road, Rd 1, Wainuiomata, 5373 New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Jul 2010 to 26 Mar 2012
Address: 320 Moores Valley Road, Rd 1, Wainuiomata, 5373 New Zealand
Physical address used from 06 Jul 2010 to 07 Jul 2010
Address: 320 Moores Valley Road, Rd 1, Wainuiomata, 5373 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 Jul 2010 to 26 Mar 2012
Address: C/- Tawa Financial Services, 1st Floor, 180 Main Road, Tawa New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Mar 2001 to 06 Jul 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 01 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Fx Studios Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051987909 |
Morningside Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
08 Apr 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Bartram, Yolanda |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2001 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Bartram, Yolanda |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2001 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Heydenrijk, Nicole |
Omiha Waiheke Island 1081 New Zealand |
08 Sep 2022 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Heydenrijk, Myrthe Desire |
Wainuiomata Lower Hutt 5014 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2018 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Bartram, Julian |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2013 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Bartram, Julian |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2013 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Heydenrijk, Myrthe |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
19 Aug 2011 - 28 Mar 2013 |
Individual | Schuurman, Jacomina Jacoba Gezina |
Omiha Waiheke Island 1081 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2001 - 08 Sep 2022 |
Individual | Schuurman, Jacomina Jacoba Gezina |
Omiha Waiheke Island 1081 New Zealand |
20 Mar 2001 - 08 Sep 2022 |
Nicole Heydenrijk - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2001
Address: Omiha, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2020
Address: Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Feb 2020
Jacomina Jacoba Gezina Schuurman - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2001
Address: Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Feb 2020
Address: Rd 1, Wainuiomata, 5373 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2010
Yolanda Bartram - Director
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2013
Address: Omiha, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2024
Address: Sandringham, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2022
Address: Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Feb 2019
Address: Avondale, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Sep 2013
Julian Bartram - Director
Appointment date: 23 May 2018
Address: Omiha, Waiheke Island, 1081 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2024
Address: Sandringham, Auckland, 1025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2022
Address: Morningside, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 23 May 2018
Help Foundation
382 Remuera Road
Sanders Jewellers Limited
385 Remuera Road
Remuera Fisheries 2016 Limited
388 Remuera Road
Remuera Medical Services Limited
377a Remuera Road
Meg & Molly's Clothing Alterations (1998) Limited
396 Remuera Road
Y & M Nz Limited
Suite 1, 360 Remuera Road
Eleanor Dorn Makeup Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Just Divine Limited
Level 2, 3 Margot Street
Nzealth Limited
9c Shore Road
Sum D Limited
Suite 7, 88 Broadway
Tapestry Natural Nz Limited
Level 6 / 393 Khyber Pass Road
Unichem Export Limited
602b Great South Road