Hong Orthopaedic Limited was started on 16 Mar 2001 and issued an NZ business number of 9429036967827. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Thin Foo Hong - an active director whose contract started on 16 Mar 2001,
Yvonne Hung Hung Hong - an active director whose contract started on 16 Mar 2001.
As stated in our database (last updated on 24 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 17 Hill Street, Hamilton Lake, Hamilton, 3204 (type: postal, office).
Up until 20 May 2010, Hong Orthopaedic Limited had been using Hong Orthopaedic Ltd, 17 Hill Street, Hamilton as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). In the first group, 5 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Hong, Yvonne Hung Hung (an individual) located at Rd 3, Hamilton postcode 3283.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 5% shares (exactly 5 shares) and includes
Hong, Thin Foo - located at Rd 3, Hamilton.
The third share allotment (90 shares, 90%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Hong, Thin Foo, located at Rd 3, Hamilton (an individual),
Hong, Yvonne Hung Hung, located at Rd 3, Hamilton (an individual). Hong Orthopaedic Limited has been categorised as "Orthopaedic specialist" (business classification Q851250).
Principal place of activity
17 Hill Street, Hamilton Lake, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Hong Orthopaedic Ltd, 17 Hill Street, Hamilton
Registered & physical address used from 31 Mar 2006 to 20 May 2010
Address #2: C/-ct Legal, 17 Hill Street, Hamilton
Registered & physical address used from 14 Mar 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
Address #3: C/- Tf & Yhh Hong, Newells Road, Rd3, Hamilton
Registered & physical address used from 16 Mar 2001 to 14 Mar 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 10 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Hong, Yvonne Hung Hung |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Hong, Thin Foo |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Individual | Hong, Thin Foo |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - |
Individual | Hong, Yvonne Hung Hung |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Brown, Veronica Hazel |
Hamilton New Zealand |
16 Mar 2001 - 23 Nov 2010 |
Thin Foo Hong - Director
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2001
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 2010
Yvonne Hung Hung Hong - Director
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2001
Address: Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 New Zealand
Address used since 13 May 2010
Hudson-rose Limited
Suite 4, 5 Hill Street
Rock Solid Family Limited
Suite 4, 5 Hill Street
Np Legal Trustees Limited
190 Collingwood Street
Goldline Agencies Limited
190 Collingwood Street
Np Legal Trustees (eiger) Limited
190 Collingwood Street
Dermnet New Zealand Trust
Tristam Clinic
Deverall Orthopaedics Limited
124 Lake Road
Godwin Choy Orthopaedics Limited
15 Meadowgreen Drive
Jason Donovan Orthopaedics Limited
3 London Street
Jesani Health Enterprises Limited
1026 Victoria Street
Kejriwal Orthopaedics Limited
48 Lake Crescent
Orthogonal Msk Limited
43 Hallmark Rise