Pacific Eco-Logic Limited, a registered company, was launched on 09 Apr 2001. 9429036944071 is the NZBN it was issued. "Environmental consultancy service - excluding laboratory service" (business classification M696220) is how the company is categorised. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Christopher John Richmond - an active director whose contract started on 09 Apr 2001,
Victoria Ann Froude - an active director whose contract started on 09 Apr 2001.
Last updated on 17 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 5D Deeming Road, Rd1 Russell, Bay Of Islands, 0272 (category: physical, registered).
Pacific Eco-Logic Limited had been using 5D Deeming Road, Okiato, Rd1 Russell, Bay Of Islands as their physical address up until 17 Jun 2020.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Principal place of activity
5d Deeming Road, Rd1, Russell, Bay Of Islands, 0272 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 5d Deeming Road, Okiato, Rd1 Russell, Bay Of Islands, 0272 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 May 2017 to 17 Jun 2020
Address: 5d Deeming Road, Okiato, Rd1 Russell, Bay Of Islands New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Aug 2007 to 15 May 2017
Address: 9 Kakapu Road, Rd1, Russell
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jul 2006 to 06 Aug 2007
Address: 18 Seaview Road, Paremata
Registered & physical address used from 09 Apr 2001 to 06 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 19 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Richmond, Christopher John |
Russell 0272 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Froude, Victoria Ann |
Rd1 Russell 0272 Rd1 Russell 0272 New Zealand |
20 Jun 2010 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Richmond, Christopher John |
Rd1 Russell |
09 Apr 2001 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Froude, Victoria Ann |
Rd1 Russell |
09 Apr 2001 - 20 Jun 2010 |
Christopher John Richmond - Director
Appointment date: 09 Apr 2001
Address: Rd 1, Russell, 0272 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jun 2010
Victoria Ann Froude - Director
Appointment date: 09 Apr 2001
Address: Rd 1, Russell, 0272 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jun 2010
Booeye Bay Limited
114 Te Wahapu Road
Hr Perspectivez Limited
114 Te Wahapu Road
De Bortoli Holdings Limited
32 Te Wahapu Road
Adam Environmental Limited
62 Reinga Road
Biodiversity Management Limited
C/-horwath Poutsma Ardern Limited
E3 Technologies 2015 Limited
21 Du Fresne Place
Green Tick Certification Limited
Whitelaw Weber Limited
Tangaroa Research Institute Of Oceanographic Studies Limited
108 Kerikeri Road
Wild By Nature Limited
71 Te Akau Drive