A Plus B Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 17 Apr 2001. 9429036933525 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Avril Maree Ringrose - an active director whose contract started on 17 Apr 2001,
Brent Francis Ringrose - an active director whose contract started on 17 Apr 2001.
Updated on 16 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 (types include: physical, service).
A Plus B Limited had been using Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington as their physical address up until 24 May 2019.
Old names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 17 Apr 2001 to 13 Nov 2001 they were named Brent Ringrose Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 99 shares (99 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 May 2019 to 24 May 2019
Address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Mar 2016 to 06 May 2019
Address: Level 6, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Mar 2014 to 07 Mar 2016
Address: C/-whk, Level 6, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Sep 2009 to 06 Mar 2014
Address: 23 Jillett St, Titahi Bay, Porirua
Physical & registered address used from 06 Mar 2005 to 18 Sep 2009
Address: 34 Main Road, Titahi Bay, Wellington
Registered & physical address used from 17 Apr 2001 to 06 Mar 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 12 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Ringrose, Brent Francis |
Titahi Bay Wellington |
17 Apr 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Ringrose, Avril Maree |
Titahi Bay Wellington |
17 Apr 2001 - |
Avril Maree Ringrose - Director
Appointment date: 17 Apr 2001
Address: Titahi Bay, Wellington, 5022 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Apr 2001
Brent Francis Ringrose - Director
Appointment date: 17 Apr 2001
Address: Titahi Bay, Wellington, 5022 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Apr 2001
Mcauley Finance Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Beco Builders & Contractors Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Abby Builders Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Lausanne Office Services Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Active Communications Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Hania Street Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Hania Street Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Jacaranda Holdings Limited
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House
Manchester Hawea Trading Corporation Limited
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House
Maru Holdings Limited
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House
Simlo Investments Limited
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House
Snisuoc Holdings Limited
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House