Pillars Limited, a registered company, was started on 05 Jul 2001. 9429036859207 is the NZ business number it was issued. "School - combined primary and secondary" (business classification P802320) is how the company was categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Martyn Ashley Probert - an active director whose contract began on 05 Jul 2001,
Kim Ashleigh Probert - an active director whose contract began on 11 Nov 2013,
Sandra Elizabeth Probert - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Jul 2001 and was terminated on 04 Dec 2023.
Last updated on 03 Sep 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 240 Kennedys Bush Road, Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025 (category: physical, registered).
Pillars Limited had been using Bailey Ingham Limited, Chartered Accountants, 18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga as their physical address up until 06 Sep 2013.
Former names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 05 Jul 2001 to 05 Nov 2013 they were called Colourfast Powdercoaters Nz Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 3000 shares) - Probert, Kim Ashleigh - located at 8025, Christchurch.
Previous addresses
Address: Bailey Ingham Limited, Chartered Accountants, 18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 06 Sep 2002 to 06 Sep 2013
Address: C/- Bailey Ingham, Chartered Accountants, 18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga
Registered & physical address used from 05 Jul 2001 to 06 Sep 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 02 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 3000 | |||
Individual | Probert, Kim Ashleigh |
Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
11 Nov 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Probert, Sandra Elizabeth |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 8025 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - 20 Dec 2023 |
Individual | Probert, Martyn Ashley |
Kennedys Bush Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
05 Jul 2001 - 20 Dec 2023 |
Martyn Ashley Probert - Director
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2001
Address: Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2009
Kim Ashleigh Probert - Director
Appointment date: 11 Nov 2013
Address: Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2014
Sandra Elizabeth Probert - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Jul 2001
Termination date: 04 Dec 2023
Address: Kennedys Bush, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2009
Process Consulting Services (nz) Limited
241 Kennedys Bush Road
High Road Solutions Limited
230 Kennedy's Bush Road
Reilly's Bricklaying Limited
220 Kennedys Bush Road
Lyall Lukey Resources Limited
208 Kennedys Bush Road
Ch&associates Limited
265 Kennedys Bush Road
Jfgt Holdings Limited
234 Kennedys Bush Road
Educational Solutions Limited
5 The Mews
Edukatenz Consultancy Limited
30 Te Ara Crescent
Ete Teaching Limited
Unit 12, 337 Harewood Road
M2ie Consulting Limited
65 Regency Crescent
Pathfinders New Zealand Limited
21 Marsden Street
The Inzone Experience Limited
Upper Sefton Road