Mildroy Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 19 Sep 2001. 9429036767496 is the NZBN it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is how the company is classified. The company has been run by 1 director, named Roy Francis Ignatius Menzies - an active director whose contract began on 19 Sep 2001.
Last updated on 28 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 7 College Road, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 (type: registered, physical).
Mildroy Holdings Limited had been using 7 College Road, St. Johns, Auckland 1072 as their registered address up to 04 Oct 2012.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 95 shares (95 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 5 shares (5 per cent).
Principal place of activity
7 College Road, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 7 College Road, St. Johns, Auckland 1072 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Sep 2007 to 04 Oct 2012
Address #2: 7 College Road, St Johns, Auckland 1005
Physical & registered address used from 03 Dec 2004 to 21 Sep 2007
Address #3: Level 3a, Krukziener House, 17 Albert St, Auckland
Physical address used from 31 Oct 2002 to 03 Dec 2004
Address #4: Level 3a, Krukziener House, 17 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 31 Oct 2002 to 03 Dec 2004
Address #5: 7 College Road, St Johns, Auckland
Registered address used from 30 Sep 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
Address #6: 7 College Rd, St Johns, Auckland 1005
Registered address used from 18 Jan 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Address #7: 7 College Rd, St Johns, Auckland 1005
Physical address used from 19 Dec 2001 to 31 Oct 2002
Address #8: Level 3a, Krukziener House, 17 Albert St, Auckland
Physical address used from 19 Dec 2001 to 19 Dec 2001
Address #9: Level 3a, Krukziener House, 17 Albert St, Auckland
Registered address used from 19 Dec 2001 to 18 Jan 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 15 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 95 | |||
Individual | Menzies, Roy Francis Ignatius |
St Johns Auckland |
19 Sep 2001 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5 | |||
Individual | Menzies, Mildred Dulcine |
St Johns Auckland |
19 Sep 2001 - |
Roy Francis Ignatius Menzies - Director
Appointment date: 19 Sep 2001
Address: Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Apr 2018
Address: St Johns, Auckland, 1072 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Apr 2015
Menzies Holdings Limited
7 College Road
Golden Ray Nz Limited
15 Kissling Place
Solid Gold Trustee Limited
15 Kissling Place
Gr Advisory Group Limited
15 Kissling Place
Interlatino New Zealand Limited
Flat 2, 193 St Johns Road
Bartlett-wright Trustee Limited
2/193 St Jons Road
Cnew Rentals Limited
179b St Johns Road
Farr Waikato Limited
2/6 Waikato Place
Fernandez Investments And Properties Limited
22 Kissling Place
Giwc Limited
97 Norman Lesser Drive
Katfish Limited
201a St Johns Road
Muckle Developments Limited
2c Thorpe St