Abano Nominees Limited was launched on 26 Sep 2001 and issued a business number of 9429036763054. This removed LTD company has been managed by 9 directors: Nisha Marian Clark - an active director whose contract began on 14 Apr 2022,
Stephen Telford Spencer Davies - an inactive director whose contract began on 26 Feb 2021 and was terminated on 14 Apr 2022,
Nicholas Voss - an inactive director whose contract began on 18 Nov 2020 and was terminated on 26 Oct 2021,
Richard George Keys - an inactive director whose contract began on 31 Jul 2003 and was terminated on 26 Feb 2021,
Andrew Richard Purcell Tapper - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Jul 2018 and was terminated on 20 Nov 2020.
According to BizDb's information (updated on 27 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: Level 11, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland, 1010 (category: physical, service).
Up until 04 Aug 2021, Abano Nominees Limited had been using Level 11, Amp Centre, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb found more names for the company: from 26 Sep 2001 to 13 Apr 2005 they were named Eldercare Nominees Limited.
A total of 1 share is allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Abano Healthcare Group Limited (an entity) located at 29 Customs Street West, Auckland postcode 1010.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 11, Amp Centre, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Feb 2019 to 04 Aug 2021
Address: Level 16, West Plaza, 3-7 Albert Street, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Nov 2005 to 18 Feb 2019
Address: Level 27, Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 21 Jul 2005 to 16 Nov 2005
Address: Ground Floor, Mantrack House, 2, Hargreaves Str, College Hill, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 26 Sep 2001 to 21 Jul 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 27 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Abano Healthcare Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040925417 |
29 Customs Street West Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2001 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Nisha Marian Clark - Director
Appointment date: 14 Apr 2022
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2022
Stephen Telford Spencer Davies - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Feb 2021
Termination date: 14 Apr 2022
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Feb 2021
Nicholas Voss - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Nov 2020
Termination date: 26 Oct 2021
Address: Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Nov 2020
Richard George Keys - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Jul 2003
Termination date: 26 Feb 2021
Address: Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Mar 2010
Andrew Richard Purcell Tapper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Jul 2018
Termination date: 20 Nov 2020
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2018
Rhys Lloyd Clark - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 May 2019
Termination date: 23 Oct 2020
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2019
Rachel Jane Walsh - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2015
Termination date: 28 Jun 2018
Address: Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Nov 2015
Alan William Clarke - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Sep 2001
Termination date: 02 Nov 2015
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Sep 2001
Brian Thomas Monk - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Oct 2001
Termination date: 31 Jul 2003
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Oct 2001
Drywall Interiors Commercial Limited
89 Albert St
New Star Consultants Limited
Suite 2a & 3, Level 8, Albert Plaza
Grand Pacific Tours Pty Limited
Suite 1, Level 7, Albert Plaza
Job Monster Limited
Suite 7, L6, 87-89 Albert Street
Oe Education Consulting Company Limited
87-89 Albert Street
A Touch Of Davinci Limited
Suite 2, 87 Albert Street